This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2018 at 07:00:45 (UTC).

Toy et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 Toy filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S Hixson and Thomas S. Hixson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-05422

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas S Hixson

Thomas S. Hixson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lauren Flaherty

Edward Toy

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Andrew Handler

Attorney at Donahue Fitzgerald LLP

1999 Harrison Street, 25Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Daniel B Newbold

Attorney at Donahue Fitzgerald LLP

1999 Harrison Street, 25Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Steven Kuang-Yu Lee

Attorney at Donahue Gallagher Woods LLP

1999 Harrisopn Street, Po Box 12979, 24Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lauren Flaherty, Edward Toy on United States of America -Jeff Sessions (Newbold, Daniel) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Order setting Case Management Conference, Civil Standing Order for Judge Hixon, Blank Waiver of Service of Summons served on United States of America c/o US Attorney General, San Francisco on 09/28/2018, filed by Lauren Flaherty, Edward Toy. (Newbold, Daniel) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. (Newbold, Daniel) (Filed on 9/18/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#3

(#3) ***erroneous docket entry***Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) Modified on 9/10/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Refund of Personal Income Tax against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12649626.). Filed byEdward Toy, Lauren Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Handler, Eric) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lauren Flaherty, Edward Toy on United States of America -Jeff Sessions (Newbold, Daniel) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Order setting Case Management Conference, Civil Standing Order for Judge Hixon, Blank Waiver of Service of Summons served on United States of America c/o US Attorney General, San Francisco on 09/28/2018, filed by Lauren Flaherty, Edward Toy. (Newbold, Daniel) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. (Newbold, Daniel) (Filed on 9/18/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ***erroneous docket entry***Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) Modified on 9/10/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/18/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Refund of Personal Income Tax against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12649626.). Filed byEdward Toy, Lauren Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Handler, Eric) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less