This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2018 at 07:59:59 (UTC).

Torres v. Talbott et al (PLR2)

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Torres filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Talbott PLR2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ivy Torres

Defendants

John Talbott

The University of the South

Dara Talbott

Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

Deidre Talbott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph G DeGaetano

Attorney at DeGaetano Law Firm

50 Frazier Avenue, Suite 300

Chattanooga, TN 37405

Defendant Attorneys

Travis B Holly

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Chatt)

1900 Republic Centre, 633 Chestnut Street

Chattanooga, TN 37450

K Stephen Powers

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Chatt)

1900 Republic Centre, 633 Chestnut Street

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Craig R Allen

Attorney at Leitner Williams Dooley Napolitan, PLLC (Chattanooga)

200 W. Martin Luther King Boulevard, Tallan Building, Suite 500

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Benjamin T. Reese

Attorney at Leitner Williams Dooley Napolitan, PLLC (Chattanooga)

200 W. Martin Luther King Boulevard, Tallan Building, Suite 500

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Kenneth W Ward

Attorney at Trammell, Adkins & Ward, PC

Post Office Box 51450

Knoxville, TN 37950-1450

 

Court Documents

31 #3

Other

31 #2

Other

31 #1

Other

#31

(#31) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by The University of the South. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Other, #3 Other)(Allen, Craig) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#30

(#30) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DeGaetano, Joseph) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#29

(#29) NOTICE OF CONSENT by Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott (Powers, K) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#28

(#28) Certificate of Corporate Interest by The University of the South. (Allen, Craig) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#27

(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The University of the South.(Allen, Craig) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R Allen on behalf of The University of the South (Allen, Craig) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/3/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/3/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/3/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

2 #4

Summons Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

2 #3

Summons The University of the South

2 #2

Summons John Talbott

2 #1

Summons Deidre Talbott

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott, The University of the South. (Attachments: #1 Summons Deidre Talbott, #2 Summons John Talbott, #3 Summons The University of the South, #4 Summons Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois)(JCK) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#1

(#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Ward, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by The University of the South. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Other, #3 Other)(Allen, Craig) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DeGaetano, Joseph) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE OF CONSENT by Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott (Powers, K) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Certificate of Corporate Interest by The University of the South. (Allen, Craig) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The University of the South.(Allen, Craig) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott.(Powers, K) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Ward, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Ward, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Ward, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on John Talbott on 8/8/2018, filed by Ivy Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail receipt)(DeGaetano, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Deidre Talbott on 8/8/2018, filed by Ivy Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail receipt)(DeGaetano, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Dara Talbott on 8/8/2018, filed by Ivy Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail receipt)(DeGaetano, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R Allen on behalf of The University of the South (Allen, Craig) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/3/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/3/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/3/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott, The University of the South. (Attachments: #1 Summons Deidre Talbott, #2 Summons John Talbott, #3 Summons The University of the South, #4 Summons Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois)(JCK) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3733709.), filed by Ivy Torres. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Dara Talbott, #3 Summons Summons to Deidre Talbott, #4 Summons Summons to John Talbott, #5 Summons Summons to The University of the South, #6 Summons Summons to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (UM carrier))(DeGaetano, Joseph) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less