This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2014 at 06:18:06 (UTC).

Torres v. Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc.,

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Torres filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co , Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-04613

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorge Luis Torres

Defendant

Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alvar Ayala

Attorney at Workers' Law Office, P.C.

401 S. Lasalle, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60605

Jenee Gaskin

Attorney at Workers' Law Office, P.c.

401 S. Lasalle St., Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60605

Christopher J Williams

Attorney at Workers' Law Office, PC

401 S. Lasalle, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60605

Defendant Attorney

Michael Martin-Johnston

Attorney at Waltz, Palmer & Dawson, LLC

3701 Algonquin Road, Suite 390

Rolling Meadows, IL 60008

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Luis Torres by Alvar Ayala (Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 11/7/2014 to answer or otherwise plead #9 is granted. Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Luis Torres by Jenee Gaskin (Gaskin, Jenee) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Martin-Johnston for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #9 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/20/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Motion by Alvar Ayala for presentment of motion to certify class #12 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Luis Torres by Christopher J Williams (Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#8

(#8) Rule 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc., (Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 10/03/2014)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative defenses by Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc.,(Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2014)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jorge Luis Torres; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9591945.(Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Plaintiff Jorge Luis Torres to certify class (Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Hearing on Plaintiff's motion to certify class #12 is continued to 11/24/2014 at 9:30 AM. Scheduling Conference reset to 11/24/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc., by Michael Martin-Johnston (Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 10/03/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Defendant Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc., for extension of time to file its answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (unopposed motion) (Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Luis Torres as to Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc., on 9/5/2014, answer due 9/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance for Service on Secretary of State)(Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

6 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance for Service on Secretary of State

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative defenses by Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc.,(Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Hearing on Plaintiff's motion to certify class #12 is continued to 11/24/2014 at 9:30 AM. Scheduling Conference reset to 11/24/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Motion by Alvar Ayala for presentment of motion to certify class #12 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION by Plaintiff Jorge Luis Torres to certify class (Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 11/7/2014 to answer or otherwise plead #9 is granted. Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2014 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Martin-Johnston for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #9 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/20/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Defendant Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc., for extension of time to file its answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (unopposed motion) (Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Rule 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc., (Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 10/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc., by Michael Martin-Johnston (Martin-Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 10/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Luis Torres as to Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc., on 9/5/2014, answer due 9/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance for Service on Secretary of State)(Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Guy Scopelliti Original Landscaping Co., Inc., (daj, ) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. (jn, ) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Luis Torres by Jenee Gaskin (Gaskin, Jenee) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Luis Torres by Christopher J Williams (Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Luis Torres by Alvar Ayala (Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jorge Luis Torres; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9591945.(Ayala, Alvar) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.