This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2018 at 07:19:28 (UTC).

Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC v. Bitstrata Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bitstrata Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02225

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC

Defendant

Bitstrata Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Garvin

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cleveland

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Patrick R. Akers

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cleveland

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Alyssa M. Caridis

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe - Los Angeles

777 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Geoffrey G. Moss

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe - Los Angeles

777 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Clement S. Roberts

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe - San Francisco

Orrick Bldg., 405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorneys

Monica L. Dias

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd - Cincinnati

3300 Great American Center, 301 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Ann G. Schoen

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd - Cincinnati

3300 Great American Center, 301 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 11/14/18. By 11/28/18, Defendant shall either file an Amended Complaint -- with an Answer to follow no later than 12/19/18 -- or parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule for a Motion to Dismiss. Counsel are also reminded that the Local Patent Rules apply and should be considered in later discussions. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/14/18. (S,Na) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

15 #1

ACTL Code of Conduct

#15

(#15) Marginal Entry Order granting #14 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ann G. Schoen for Bitstrata Systems, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Affidavit of Ann G. Schoen

#14

(#14) Motion for attorney Ann G. Schoen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8958253, filed by Defendant Bitstrata Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ann G. Schoen, #2 Proposed Order)(Dias, Monica) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#13

(#13) Attorney Appearance by Monica L. Dias filed by on behalf of Bitstrata Systems, Inc.. (Dias, Monica) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#12

(#12) Marginal Entry Order granting #9 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Geoffrey G. Moss for Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#9

(#9) Motion for attorney Geoffrey G. Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8945277, filed by Plaintiff Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Akers, Patrick) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#6

(#6) Return of Service by personal service executed upon Bitstrata Systems, Inc. on 9/27/2018, filed on behalf of Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC (Akers, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: #1 Both pages of return (Fully completed document)) (S,L). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#5

(#5) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/27/2018. (S,JM) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

4 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#4

(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Bitstrata Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#3

(#3) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. (Akers, Patrick) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Topcon Corporation (Japan) for Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC filed by Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. (Akers, Patrick) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Bitstrata Systems, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8930639.. Filed by Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Akers, Patrick) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 11/14/18. By 11/28/18, Defendant shall either file an Amended Complaint -- with an Answer to follow no later than 12/19/18 -- or parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule for a Motion to Dismiss. Counsel are also reminded that the Local Patent Rules apply and should be considered in later discussions. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/14/18. (S,Na) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 11/14/18 at 10:30 AM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed before the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Marginal Entry Order granting #14 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ann G. Schoen for Bitstrata Systems, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Motion for attorney Ann G. Schoen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8958253, filed by Defendant Bitstrata Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ann G. Schoen, #2 Proposed Order)(Dias, Monica) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Attorney Appearance by Monica L. Dias filed by on behalf of Bitstrata Systems, Inc.. (Dias, Monica) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Marginal Entry Order granting #9 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Geoffrey G. Moss for Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Marginal Entry Order granting #8 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Alyssa M. Caridis for Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Marginal Entry Order granting #7 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Clements S. Roberts for Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Motion for attorney Geoffrey G. Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8945277, filed by Plaintiff Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Akers, Patrick) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Motion for attorney Alyssa M. Caridis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8945270, filed by Plaintiff Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Akers, Patrick) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service by personal service executed upon Bitstrata Systems, Inc. on 9/27/2018, filed on behalf of Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC (Akers, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: #1 Both pages of return (Fully completed document)) (S,L). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (S,JM) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/27/2018. (S,JM) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (S,JM) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Bitstrata Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (S,JM) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (S,JM) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. (Akers, Patrick) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Topcon Corporation (Japan) for Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC filed by Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. (Akers, Patrick) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against Bitstrata Systems, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8930639.. Filed by Topcon Agriculture Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Akers, Patrick) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey G Moss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alyssa Margaret Caridis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clement Seth Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Garvin