This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 09:44:41 (UTC).

Top Tobacco, L. P. et al v. S&N Enterprises, Inc. of Virginia et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 Top Tobacco, L P filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against N Enterprises, Inc of Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02783

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Top Tobacco, L. P.

Republic Tobacco, L. P.

Defendants

S&N Enterprises, Inc. of Virginia d/b/a S&N Enterprises, Inc.

Harsh Paresh Patel

S&N Enterprises, Inc. of Virginia

S&N Enterprises, Inc. of Virginia doing business as S&N Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sheldon Toby Zenner

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

525 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Alexandra McNicholas

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman Llp

525 W. Monroe

Chicago, IL 60661

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Daniel Roth

Attorney at Roth Fioretti LLC

311 S. Wacker, Ste 2470

Chicago, IL 60606

Kenneth Young Hurst

Attorney at Roth Fioretti LLC

311 S. Wacker, Suite 2470

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Weisman to conduct a settlement conference and discuss general issues related to settlement. Status hearing set for 6/25/18 at 9:15 a.m. Prior to the status hearing, the Court respectfully requests that counsel consult the Court's standing order on settlement conferences and related materials in advance of the status hearing. Judge Weisman generally conducts settlement conferences Tuesdays, Wednesdays, Thursdays, and Fridays at either 10:30 a.m. to 12:30 p.m. or 2:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. Other dates and times may be available as required by the Court or the parties. The Court specifically requests that counsel must have available dates for all necessary parties in advance of the status hearing, and to the extent possible, consult with opposing counsel in an attempt to identify mutually convenient and feasible dates for the settlement conference. Mailed notice (ao,) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

#28

(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. All fact discovery must be noticed in time to be completed by 1/30/19. Any requests to amend the pleadings must be made by 11/6/18. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for the purposes of settlement discussions. Continued status hearing is set for 11/1/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#27

(#27) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable M. David Weisman for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference. (psm, )Notices mailed. (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#25

(#25) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#24

(#24) Joint Statement Regarding Participation in the Voluntary Mediation Program for Lanham Act Cases STATEMENT by Republic Tobacco, L. P., Top Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#23

(#23) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#22

(#22) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Republic Tobacco, L. P., Top Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

21 #1

Notice of Filing Answer to Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Affirmative Defen

#21

(#21) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Harsh Paresh Patel, S&N Enterprises, Inc. of Virginia (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Answer to Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Affirmative Defenses)(Roth, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2018)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Tobacco, L. P., Top Tobacco, L. P. by Sheldon Toby Zenner (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 by Republic Tobacco, L. P., Top Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Republic Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Top Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Top Tobacco, L. P., Republic Tobacco, L. P.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14370125. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Weisman to conduct a settlement conference and discuss general issues related to settlement. Status hearing set for 6/25/18 at 9:15 a.m. Prior to the status hearing, the Court respectfully requests that counsel consult the Court's standing order on settlement conferences and related materials in advance of the status hearing. Judge Weisman generally conducts settlement conferences Tuesdays, Wednesdays, Thursdays, and Fridays at either 10:30 a.m. to 12:30 p.m. or 2:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. Other dates and times may be available as required by the Court or the parties. The Court specifically requests that counsel must have available dates for all necessary parties in advance of the status hearing, and to the extent possible, consult with opposing counsel in an attempt to identify mutually convenient and feasible dates for the settlement conference. Mailed notice (ao,) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. All fact discovery must be noticed in time to be completed by 1/30/19. Any requests to amend the pleadings must be made by 11/6/18. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for the purposes of settlement discussions. Continued status hearing is set for 11/1/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable M. David Weisman for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference. (psm, )Notices mailed. (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • (#26) Entered in error. (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Joint Statement Regarding Participation in the Voluntary Mediation Program for Lanham Act Cases STATEMENT by Republic Tobacco, L. P., Top Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Republic Tobacco, L. P., Top Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Harsh Paresh Patel, S&N Enterprises, Inc. of Virginia (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Answer to Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Affirmative Defenses)(Roth, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATE NOTICE OF LANHAM ACT MEDIATION PROGRAM (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 06/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(pk, ) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (jn, ) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Tobacco, L. P., Top Tobacco, L. P. by Alexandra McNicholas (McNicholas, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Tobacco, L. P., Top Tobacco, L. P. by Sheldon Toby Zenner (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 by Republic Tobacco, L. P., Top Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Republic Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Top Tobacco, L. P. (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Top Tobacco, L. P., Republic Tobacco, L. P.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14370125. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S&N Enterprises, Inc. of Virginia d/b/a S&N Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Daniel Roth