This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2018 at 07:15:34 (UTC).

Tomson v. Ferguson et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Tomson filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Ferguson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Loretta A. Preska. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-08149

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Loretta A. Preska

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Tomson

Defendants

Sam Backenroth

June S. Almenoff

Michael Ferguson

Orin Hirschman

Thomas M. Riedhammer

Jason S. Slakter

Irach Taraporewala

Nominal Defendant

Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Eli Levi

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-01284. Document filed by John Tomson.(Levi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Levi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to June S. Almenoff, Sam Backenroth, Michael Ferguson, Orin Hirschman, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Thomas M. Riedhammer, Jason S. Slakter, Irach Taraporewala. (pc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Ferguson, Jason S. Slakter, Sam Backenroth, Orin Hirschman, Irach Taraporewala, Thomas M. Riedhammer, June S. Almenoff, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Tomson. (Levi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

2 #1

Supplement Related Case Statement

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Related Case Statement)(Levi, Joseph) Modified on 9/7/2018 (pc). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

1 #1

Affidavit Verification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against June S. Almenoff, Sam Backenroth, Michael Ferguson, Orin Hirschman, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Thomas M. Riedhammer, Jason S. Slakter, Irach Taraporewala. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15538215)Document filed by John Tomson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification)(Levi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-01284-LAP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-01284. Document filed by John Tomson.(Levi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Levi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to June S. Almenoff, Sam Backenroth, Michael Ferguson, Orin Hirschman, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Thomas M. Riedhammer, Jason S. Slakter, Irach Taraporewala. (pc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Loretta A. Preska as possibly related to 18cv1284. (pc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Joseph Eli Levi to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (pc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joseph Eli Levi to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Eli Levi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Eli Levi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Tomson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Ferguson, Jason S. Slakter, Sam Backenroth, Orin Hirschman, Irach Taraporewala, Thomas M. Riedhammer, June S. Almenoff, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Tomson. (Levi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Related Case Statement)(Levi, Joseph) Modified on 9/7/2018 (pc). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against June S. Almenoff, Sam Backenroth, Michael Ferguson, Orin Hirschman, Ohr Pharmaceutical, Inc., Thomas M. Riedhammer, Jason S. Slakter, Irach Taraporewala. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15538215)Document filed by John Tomson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification)(Levi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less