This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2019 at 07:37:28 (UTC).

Toce et al v. Hays Companies et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Toce filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hays Companies. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01048

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Toce

Johnette Toce

Defendants

Victor T. Cox

Hays Compaies

Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc.

Hays Companies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andre' F. Toce

Attorney at The Toce Firm, APLC

969 Coolidge Boulevard

Lafayette, LA 70505

Defendant Attorneys

Christy Amuny

550 Fannin, Suit 400

Beaumont, TX 77701

Mandie M. Cash

Attorney at Jones Walker

8555 United Plaza Blvd., Ste. 500

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

James R. Nieset, Jr.

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson - NO

704 Carondelet St.

New Orleans, LA 70130-3774

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for January 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. Within 45 days, the parties shall sign and electronically file the attached consent form advising the Court that they agree to have a Magistrate Judge handle the remaining aspects of this case. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2019. Discovery due by 7/1/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 4/30/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 5/30/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/15/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/15/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 8/30/2019. Motions shall be filed by 9/30/2019. The district judge will set the remaining deadlines, including dates for a pretrialconference and trial in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (JSL) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

12 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Christy Amuny in place of Mandie M. Cash as Attorney of Record by Victor T. Cox, Hays Companies. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Amuny, Christy) (Entered: 01/19/2019)

#11

(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Toce, Andre') (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/17/2019 to remove incomplete consent form) (NLT). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Christy Amuny in place of James R. Nieset, Jr. as Attorney of Record by Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amuny, Christy) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 03:15 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Parties and Disclosure Statements by Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc., Victor T. Cox, Hays Companies identifying Corporate Parent The HG Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hays Group, Inc. for Hays Companies.. (Nieset, James) Modified on 12/3/2018 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#6

(#6) Letter to Attorney Andre' F. Toce regarding Jessica L. Yaeger who is Co-Counsel for party Johnette and Eric Toce. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Letter to Attorney James R. Nieset, Jr. regarding Christy Amuny who is Co-Counsel for party Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#4

(#4) Consent to Removal by Victor T. Cox (NLT) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#3

(#3) Consent to Removal by Hays Companies (NLT) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #7

Exhibit G

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for January 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. Within 45 days, the parties shall sign and electronically file the attached consent form advising the Court that they agree to have a Magistrate Judge handle the remaining aspects of this case. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2019. Discovery due by 7/1/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 4/30/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 5/30/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/15/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/15/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 8/30/2019. Motions shall be filed by 9/30/2019. The district judge will set the remaining deadlines, including dates for a pretrialconference and trial in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (JSL) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Christy Amuny substituted as lead counsel and attorney of record for Victor T. Cox and Hays Companies replacing Mandie M. Cash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Christy Amuny in place of Mandie M. Cash as Attorney of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Christy Amuny in place of Mandie M. Cash as Attorney of Record by Victor T. Cox, Hays Companies. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Amuny, Christy) (Entered: 01/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STATUS REPORT Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Toce, Andre') (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/17/2019 to remove incomplete consent form) (NLT). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Christy Amuny is substituted as counsel of record for Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc. replacing James R. Nieset, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Christy Amuny in place of James R. Nieset, Jr. as Attorney of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Christy Amuny in place of James R. Nieset, Jr. as Attorney of Record by Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amuny, Christy) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 03:15 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interested Parties and Disclosure Statements by Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc., Victor T. Cox, Hays Companies identifying Corporate Parent The HG Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hays Group, Inc. for Hays Companies.. (Nieset, James) Modified on 12/3/2018 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter to Attorney Andre' F. Toce regarding Jessica L. Yaeger who is Co-Counsel for party Johnette and Eric Toce. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter to Attorney James R. Nieset, Jr. regarding Christy Amuny who is Co-Counsel for party Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent to Removal by Victor T. Cox (NLT) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent to Removal by Hays Companies (NLT) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Compliance by Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc. to #1 Notice of Removal, (Nieset, James) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number C-672210. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1867960), filed by Cargill Meat Logistics Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nieset, James) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.