This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2019 at 07:42:20 (UTC).

Titan Pro SCI, Inc. v. Stone

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 Titan Pro SCI, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Stone. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-03061

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Titan Pro SCI, Inc.

Titan Pro SCI, Inc

Defendant

Herbert Stone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam R Foresman

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

801 Grand Avenue, 33Rd Floor, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309-8011

Defendant Attorneys

Davin C Curtiss

Attorney at O'Connor & Thomas

1000 Main Street, ***Ecf

Dubuque, IA 52001

Christopher Charles Fry

Attorney at O'Connor & Thomas, PC

1000 Main Street

Dubuque, IA 52001

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Herbert Stone.(Curtiss, Davin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Herbert Stone. Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/4/2018. (skm) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#5

(#5) UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading by Defendant Herbert Stone (Curtiss, Davin) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Titan Pro SCI, Inc (Foresman, Adam) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

3 #1

New Case Packet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Herbert Stone. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/6/2018. (jjh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Herbert Stone ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2808659.), filed by Titan Pro SCI, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 2/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Foresman, Adam) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Herbert Stone.(Curtiss, Davin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Herbert Stone. Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/4/2018. (skm) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading by Defendant Herbert Stone (Curtiss, Davin) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Titan Pro SCI, Inc (Foresman, Adam) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/26/2018. (jjh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Herbert Stone. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/6/2018. (jjh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Herbert Stone ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2808659.), filed by Titan Pro SCI, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 2/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Foresman, Adam) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.