This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:37:50 (UTC).

Tipler v. Nancy A Berryhill

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Tipler filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Nancy A Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Irma Carrillo Ramirez and Jane J. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02245

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Irma Carrillo Ramirez

Presiding Judge

Jane J. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Tipler

Defendant

Nancy A Berryhill

Interested Party

Social Security Administration - Interested Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel A Skaar

Attorney at Skaar Law

122 Fall Creek

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons for defendant, and deliver the summons and copies of the complaint and the notice of right to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge to the United States Marshal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/27/2018) (axm) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy A Berryhill; served on 9/5/2018; Attorney General; served on 9/7/2018; US Attorney; served on 9/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attorney General, #2 US Attorney) (epm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #4 Consent, #6 Summons Issued, #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint. Signed on 8/27/2018. (rekc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (axm) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons for defendant, and deliver the summons and copies of the complaint and the notice of right to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge to the United States Marshal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/27/2018) (axm) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Tipler. (Skaar, Daniel) Modified text on 8/24/2018 (mcrd). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Tipler. (Skaar, Daniel) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill filed by David Tipler. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Skaar, Daniel) Modified defendant on 8/24/2018 (mcrd). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.