This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2018 at 07:29:00 (UTC).

Tim Hortons USA, Inc. et al v. Tims Milner LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 Tim Hortons USA, Inc filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Tims Milner LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-24152

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Tim Hortons USA, Inc.

100 Se Second Street, 44Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc.

100 Se Second Street, 44Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Tims 12 Mile LLC

Tims Greenfield LLC

Baby Buford Holdings LLC

Nicole Wilski

Grosse Pointe, MI 48236

Jimmy Rahaim

Grosse Pointe, MI 48236

Tims Evergreen LLC

Tims Compuware LLC

Tims Five-Mile LLC

Tims Milner LLC

Tims 8 Mile LLC

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Nina Greene

Attorney at Genovese Joblove & Battista

100 Se 2Nd Street, Suite 4400

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Robert Mitchell Einhorn

Attorney at Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.

2 S. Biscayne Blvd., 34Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Alaina Brooke Siminovsky

Attorney at Zarco, Einhorn, Salkowski & Brito, P.A.

2 S. Biscayne Blvd. 34Th Floor, One Biscayne Tower

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Nicole Wilski identifying Other Affiliate Kava Restaurants LLC, Other Affiliate Thomas R. Reedy for Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Nicole Wilski, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC (Siminovsky, Alaina) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#22

(#22) Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Restaurant Brands International Inc., a Canadian Corporation for Tim Hortons USA, Inc. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#21

(#21) Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#20

(#20) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greene, Nina) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#19

(#19) ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before December 5, 2018, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

18 #7

Exhibit 7

18 #5

Exhibit 5

18 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #9

Summon(s) Tims Evergreen LLC

1 #8

Summon(s) Jimmy Rahaim

1 #7

Summon(s) Nicole Wilski

1 #6

Summon(s) Tims Greenfield LLC

1 #5

Summon(s) Tims Five-Mile LLC

1 #4

Summon(s) Tims 8 Mile LLC

1 #3

Summon(s) Tims 12 Mile LLC

1 #2

Summon(s) Tims Milner LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Nicole Wilski identifying Other Affiliate Kava Restaurants LLC, Other Affiliate Thomas R. Reedy for Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Nicole Wilski, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC (Siminovsky, Alaina) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Restaurant Brands International Inc., a Canadian Corporation for Tim Hortons USA, Inc. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greene, Nina) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before December 5, 2018, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Defendants ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Nicole Wilski, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Siminovsky, Alaina) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Mitchell Einhorn on behalf of Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Nicole Wilski. Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Baby Buford Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Jimmy Rahaim(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims 12 Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims 8 Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Compuware LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Evergreen LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Five-Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Greenfield LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Milner LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Nicole Wilski(pty:dft). (Einhorn, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendants' shall file their Response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before November 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Nicole Wilski. Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Baby Buford Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Jimmy Rahaim(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims 12 Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims 8 Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Compuware LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Evergreen LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Five-Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Greenfield LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Milner LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Nicole Wilski(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siminovsky, Alaina) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Baby Buford Holdings LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Jimmy Rahaim served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims Greenfield LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims Five-Mile LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims 8 Mile LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims 12 Mile LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims Milner LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Nicole Wilski. (jas) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11058089, filed by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Tims Milner LLC, #3 Summon(s) Tims 12 Mile LLC, #4 Summon(s) Tims 8 Mile LLC, #5 Summon(s) Tims Five-Mile LLC, #6 Summon(s) Tims Greenfield LLC, #7 Summon(s) Nicole Wilski, #8 Summon(s) Jimmy Rahaim, #9 Summon(s) Tims Evergreen LLC, #10 Summon(s) Tims Compuware LLC, #11 Summon(s) Baby Buford Holdings LLC)(Greene, Nina) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less