This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2020 at 04:07:06 (UTC).

Tichy v. Hyatt Hotels Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 Tichy filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hyatt Hotels Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01959

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Karen Tichy

Maarten Albarda

Barry Bagnato

Defendants

Choice Hotels International, Inc.

Intercontinental Hotels Group PLC

Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.

Hyatt Hotels Corporation

Wyndham Worldwide Corporation

Marriott International Inc.

Hyatt Corporation

Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc.

Six Continents Hotels, Inc.

Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 2Nd Ave., Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Elizabeth A. Fegan

Attorney at Fegan Scott, LLC

150 S. Wacker Dr., 24Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Eugene A Burrus

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 8Th Ave

Seattle, WA 98101

Zoran Tasic

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

455 N. Cityfront Plaza Dr., Suite 2410

Chicago, IL 60611

Defendant Attorneys

John Robert Robertson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

444 W. Lake Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael S. Pullos

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

444 West Lake Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael K Molzberger

Attorney at Schiff Hardin

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 6600

Chicago, IL 60606

Ann H. MacDonald

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60605

Robert J Wierenga

Attorney at Schiff Hardin Llp

350 South Main Street, Suite 210

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Paula J. Morency

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60605

Shari Ross Lahlou

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1900 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1110

Adam Glenn Kelly

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60610

Sean M. Berkowitz

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

330 N. Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Christopher S. Yates

Attorney at Latham & Watkins Llp

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Brian E. Cohen

Attorney at Novack and Macey LLP

100 North Riverside Plaza, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jeffrey S. Cashdan

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Zachary Thomas Fardon

Attorney at King & Spalding

353 N. Clark, 12Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

Danielle Chattin

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Lohr A. Beck-Kemp

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Emily Shoemaker Newton

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#97

#96

#154

#153

RESTRICTED

#152

#151

#150

#149

#148

#147

#146

#145

#144

#143

#142

#141

#140

#139

155 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16746874. for Logan Robert Hobson (Hobson, Logan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/6/20 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Order Number: 37781. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward - (312)435-5561 - wardofficialtranscripts@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2020. (Ward, Frances) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held and continued to 4/29/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Motion hearing held. Parties' joint motion to extend case deadlines #148 is granted as follows: Deadline to complete production of hard-copy documents and ESI is extended to 5/20/2020. Deadline to join additional parties and amend pleadings without leave is extended to 6/19/2020. Fact discovery cutoff is extended to 10/27/2020. Class Certification Plaintiff's motion, including any related expert reports is extended to 12/4/2020. Defendants' response, including any related expert report is extended to 2/19/2021. Plaintiff's reply, including any rebuttal expert reports is extended to 4/21/2021. Defendant Hilton's motion to withdraw Olivia J. Greer as counsel #150 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) NOTICE of Motion by Randi W. Singer for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #150 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/6/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Singer, Randi) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) MOTION by Attorney Olivia J. Greer to withdraw as attorney for Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc.. No party information provided (Singer, Randi) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) NOTICE of Motion by Jeannie Y Evans for presentment of extension of time #148 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Evans, Jeannie) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) MOTION by Plaintiffs Maarten Albarda, Barry Bagnato, Karen Tichy for extension of time Joint Motion to Extend Case Deadlines (Evans, Jeannie) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC by Robert J Wierenga (Wierenga, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC by Paula J. Morency (Morency, Paula) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) ANSWER to amended complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Marriott International Inc.(Kelly, Adam) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wyndham Worldwide Corporation by Paula J. Morency (Morency, Paula) (Entered: 03/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/21/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Choice Hotels International, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group PLC, Marriott International Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation (pg, ) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 5/23/2018 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14254762. (Burrus, Eugene) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (meg, ) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karen Tichy by Steve W. Berman (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by Karen Tichy; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14248461.(Berman, Steve) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hyatt Hotels Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Hyatt Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP LLC is a litigant