This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 18:06:14 (UTC).

Thrush et al v. Nassar et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 Thrush filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nassar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon J. Quist and Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01349

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon J. Quist

Referral Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Makayla Thrush

Jane D7 Doe

Defendants

United States Olympic Committee

Lawrence Gerard Nassar

John Geddert

Twistars, Inc. doing business as Geddert's Twistars Gymnastics Club USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James F. Graves

Defendant Attorneys

E. Thomas McCarthy

John R. Oostema

Cameron R. Getto

Grant David Kelter

Lauren M. Wawrzyniak

 

Court Documents

#267

650 #2

Proposed Order

650 #1

Brief in Support

650 #1041

#266

#265

#264

#263

#262

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#7

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

357 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/15/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#265) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John R9 Doe re 1041 re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend(1041 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#264) MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend (re 1:18-cv-997) by plaintiff John R9 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#263) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-1001) filed by plaintiff Samantha Schneider ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Spagnuolo, James) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/13/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#262) ORDER granting STIPULATION (1038) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#261) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1016) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/12/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#260) ORDER GRANTING MOTION (974) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#259) ORDER FOR JUDGE'S COPIES: Copies to be submitted within 7 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#258) ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (1030), (1032), (1033) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#257) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS (910), (940) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#256) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/06/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
253 More Docket Entries
12/27/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Consolidate by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. (Getto, Cameron) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING REMOVED MEMBER CASES: Motions to Consolidate to be filed within 10 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #5 filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. (Getto, Cameron) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Getto, Cameron) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2018

Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Cameron R. Getto on behalf of defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. (Getto, Cameron) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is related to 1:18-cv-1041 (jlb) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4308347 (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ingham County Circuit Court case number 18-617-NO filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less