This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2019 at 07:50:09 (UTC).

Threatt v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (JRG2)

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 Threatt filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company JRG2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Ronnie Greer and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00503

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aaron Anthony Threatt

Aaron Threatt

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael S Kelley

Attorney at Kennerly, Montgomery & Finley, P.C.

550 Main St., Bank Of America Center, 4Th Floor

Knoxville, TN 37902

Defendant Attorney

W Tyler Chastain

Attorney at Bernstein, Stair & McAdams, LLP

116 Agnes Road

Knoxville, TN 37919

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE from the State of TN, Dept of Commerce and Insurance re: Service upon State Farm Fire & Casualty. (ABF) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 01/14/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

10 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#10

(#10) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Chastain, W) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Corporate Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Chastain, W) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by W Tyler Chastain on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Chastain, W) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) DISREGARD FILED INCORRECTLY-SEE CORRECT SUMMONS ISSUED #3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Aaron Anthony Threatt as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Kelley, Michael) Modified on 11/28/2018 (DJH, ). Modified on 11/28/2018 (DJH, ). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3826739.), filed by Aaron Anthony Threatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE from the State of TN, Dept of Commerce and Insurance re: Service upon State Farm Fire & Casualty. (ABF) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 01/14/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Chastain, W) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Corporate Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Chastain, W) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by W Tyler Chastain on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Chastain, W) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISREGARD FILED INCORRECTLY-SEE CORRECT SUMMONS ISSUED #3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Aaron Anthony Threatt as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Kelley, Michael) Modified on 11/28/2018 (DJH, ). Modified on 11/28/2018 (DJH, ). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3826739.), filed by Aaron Anthony Threatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.