This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2018 at 07:55:40 (UTC).

Thompson v. USA

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 Thompson filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael John Aloi and Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Clarence Thompson

Petersburg, VA 23804

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Sarah E Wagner

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Clarksburg

320 W. Pike St., Suite 300

Clarksburg, WV 26301

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Pro Se MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Clarence Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

8 #2

Envelope

8 #1

Memorandum Of Law In Support

#8

(#8) COURT-APPROVED FORM re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Clarence Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support, #2 Envelope)(jmm) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/11/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#6

(#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice of Deficient Pleading, #2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/10/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

5 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/5/2018. (Copy Pro Se Petitioner via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

3 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Clarence Thompson. (Copy via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #1 1st page of 2255 form, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court as to Clarence Thompson. (Copy via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Attachment

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Pro Se MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Clarence Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) COURT-APPROVED FORM re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Clarence Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support, #2 Envelope)(jmm) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/11/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice of Deficient Pleading, #2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/10/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/5/2018. (Copy Pro Se Petitioner via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Wagner on behalf of USA (Wagner, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Clarence Thompson. (Copy via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #1 1st page of 2255 form, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court as to Clarence Thompson. (Copy via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Clarence Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(jmm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi added. PSLC Williams assigned to case. (jmm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less