This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2019 at 08:07:30 (UTC).

Thompson v. Hassett, et al.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Hassett. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00669

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Mondrez Thompson

Central Falls, RI 02863

Defendants

Garrett Hassett

Corporal Yanyar

Jeffrey Konieczny

Rhode Island State Police

State of Rhode Island

Lieutenant Schram

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) PLRA Filing fee: $ 11.38, receipt number 14670021847. Total Amount Paid to date: $11.38. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

15 #1

Envelope

#15

(#15) Letter from Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Docket Sheet mailed on 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

14 #2

Envelope

14 #1

Letter

#14

(#14) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Garrett Hassett, Jeffrey Konieczny, in their individual capacities only, filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson.(Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

11 #3

Envelope

11 #2

Letter

11 #1

Amended Complaint

#4

(#4) Letter from Anthony Thompson. Updated docket mailed as to all cases. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Amend/Correct Record filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Responses due by 1/2/2019. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Anthony Mondrez Thompson's #2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit is GRANTED. However, Mr. Thompson is still required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act, adopted April 25, 1996, and codified at 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), a prisoner seeking to file in forma pauperis must pay, when funds exist, an initial filing fee of the greater of 20% of the average monthly deposits to his account or the average monthly balance for the six months prior to the filing of his complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Subsequently, a prisoner must pay monthly 20% of the previous month's balance in his account. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Mr. Thompson's monthly deposits averaged $56.88 during the six-month period prior to the filing of the Complaint, as reflected in his Inmate Balance History Report. His average monthly balance during the relevant period was $1863. Accordingly, Mr. Thompson is required to pay $11.38 as an initial filing fee. The Wyatt Detention Center is directed to forward to the Court each month 20% of the previous month's balance in Mr. Thompson's account each time that amount exceeds $10.00 until he has paid the entire filing fee of $350.00 -- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Responses due by 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PLRA Filing fee: $ 11.38, receipt number 14670021847. Total Amount Paid to date: $11.38. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Letter from Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Docket Sheet mailed on 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • (#13) Letter sent to Anthony Mondrez Thompson requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Garrett Hassett, Jeffrey Konieczny, in their individual capacities only, filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson.(Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Responses due by 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Docket Sheet mailed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED, however, not for the reasons stated in his Motion. Mr. Thompson listed his cause of action on the civil cover sheet as a Code 360, "Other Personal Injury" under the heading "Torts." The Clerk's Office instead listed his action under Code 550 "Civil Rights" under the heading "Habeas Corpus". Mr. Thompson's action is not pursuant to a habeas corpus petition, so the Clerk's Office is directed to reclassify this action as a Code 360, "Other Personal Injury" under the heading "Torts." - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/22/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Anthony Mondrez Thompson's #2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit is GRANTED. However, Mr. Thompson is still required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act, adopted April 25, 1996, and codified at 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), a prisoner seeking to file in forma pauperis must pay, when funds exist, an initial filing fee of the greater of 20% of the average monthly deposits to his account or the average monthly balance for the six months prior to the filing of his complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Subsequently, a prisoner must pay monthly 20% of the previous month's balance in his account. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Mr. Thompson's monthly deposits averaged $56.88 during the six-month period prior to the filing of the Complaint, as reflected in his Inmate Balance History Report. His average monthly balance during the relevant period was $1863. Accordingly, Mr. Thompson is required to pay $11.38 as an initial filing fee. The Wyatt Detention Center is directed to forward to the Court each month 20% of the previous month's balance in Mr. Thompson's account each time that amount exceeds $10.00 until he has paid the entire filing fee of $350.00 -- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Anthony Thompson. Updated docket mailed as to all cases. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Amend/Correct Record filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Responses due by 1/2/2019. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has not complied with the federal statute on filing a request to proceed in forma pauperis. "A prisoner seeking to bring a civil action or appeal a judgment in a civil action or proceeding without prepayment of fees or security therefor, in addition to filing the affidavit filed under paragraph (1), shall submit a certified copy of the trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the prisoner for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint or notice of appeal, obtained from the appropriate official of each prison at which the prisoner is or was confined." 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Once the certified copy is filed, "the prisoner shall be required to pay the full amount of a filing fee. The court shall assess and, when funds exist, collect, as a partial payment of any court fees required by law, an initial partial filing fee of 20 percent of the greater of (A) the average monthly deposits to the prisoner's account; or (B) the average monthly balance in the prisoner's account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint or notice of appeal. (2) After payment of the initial partial filing fee, the prisoner shall be required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account. The agency having custody of the prisoner shall forward payments from the prisoner's account to the clerk of the court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the filing fees are paid." 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The plaintiff shall comply with the statute by January 11, 2019 or the Motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 will be denied and this matter will be dismissed - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/12/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 17-cr-64 this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 17-cr-64-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 17-cr-64-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less