This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2018 at 07:04:21 (UTC).

Thompson v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 Thompson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04663

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Dixon Thompson

Jamaica, NY 11434

Defendants

Mortgage Electronic Registration System

McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

RAS Boriskin, LLC

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-07123. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#3

(#3) TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case in the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/10/2018) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Queens. Case Number: 703476/2016. Document filed by Robin Dixon Thompson. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robin Dixon Thompson.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-07123. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #3 Transfer Order E.D.N.Y. (Complaint)(case opening only) to Robin Dixon Thompson 179-09 144th Road Jamaica, NY 11434. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #3 Transfer Order E.D.N.Y. (Complaint) (case opening only) to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case in the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/10/2018) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis see document #1 by Robin Dixon Thompson. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Queens. Case Number: 703476/2016. Document filed by Robin Dixon Thompson. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robin Dixon Thompson.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RAS Boriskin, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant