This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/06/2018 at 18:08:42 (UTC).

Thompson v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 Thompson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07123

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Dixon Thompson

Jamaica, NY 11434

Defendants

Mortgage Electronic Registration System

McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

RAS Boriskin, LLC

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:18-cv-04663, filed on 08/17/2018. (sjo) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #3 Transfer Order E.D.N.Y. (Complaint)(case opening only) to Robin Dixon Thompson 179-09 144th Road Jamaica, NY 11434. (vba) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #3 Transfer Order E.D.N.Y. (Complaint) (case opening only) to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (rjm) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case in the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/10/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Queens. Case Number: 703476/2016. Document filed by Robin Dixon Thompson. (sac) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robin Dixon Thompson.(sac) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RAS Boriskin, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant