This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2018 at 07:50:21 (UTC).

Thompson et al v. Childers et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2018 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Childers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00203

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elena R. Sola

Nashville, TN 37206

Maria Thompson

Sante Fe, NM 87505

Defendants

Dillon Childers

Daniel Childers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel A. LaCourse

Attorney at LaCourse Law

715 S Elgin Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorneys

Rhiannon Baker

Attorney at Holden & Montejano (Tulsa)

15 E 5Th St, Ste 3900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Drew A. Lagow

Attorney at Holden & Montejano (Tulsa)

15 E 5Th St, Ste 3900

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Drew A. Lagow on behalf of Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers (Lagow, Drew) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rhiannon Baker on behalf of Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers (Baker, Rhiannon) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/9/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Answer

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - EOA - Lagow and Baker

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons Return

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Muskogee County District Court, case number CJ-18-118 by Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Drew A. Lagow on behalf of Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers (Lagow, Drew) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rhiannon Baker on behalf of Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers (Baker, Rhiannon) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/2/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1188387 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers (Baker, Rhiannon) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/9/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Muskogee County District Court, case number CJ-18-118 by Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Daniel Childers, Dillon Childers by Maria Thompson, Elena R. Sola (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less