This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:55:03 (UTC).

Thomas v. Tennison Brothers, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Thomas filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Tennison Brothers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Diane K. Vescovo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02797

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

 

Party Details

Appellant and In Re

William H. Thomas, Jr.

Memphis, TN 38117

Appellees

Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.

Tennison Brothers, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Kathleen Ford

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

William H. Thomas, Jr.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM H. THOMAS, JR.

5160 Sanderlin, Ste. 1

Memphis, TN 38117

Appellee Attorneys

Kristina A. Woo

Attorney at THE SPENCE LAW FIRM

80 Monroe Avenue, Garden Suite One

Memphis, TN 38103

Robert L. J. Spence, Jr

Attorney at THE SPENCE LAW FIRM

80 Monroe Avenue, Garden Suite One

Memphis, TN 38103

Kathy Baker Tennison

Attorney at KATHY BAKER TENNISON, ATTORNEY AT LAW

8295 Tournament Drive, Suite 150

Memphis, TN 38125

Stuart B. Breakstone

Attorney at KATHY BAKER TENNISON, ATTORNEY AT LAW

8295 Tournament Drive, Suite 150

Memphis, TN 38125

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

5 #2

Exhibit Order Denying Motion To Transfer 2:17-cv-02067-SHL-dkv

#6

(#6) MOTION to Extend Deadline Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF #3) in Bankruptcy Appeal by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

15 #1

Appellee Tennison Brothers, Inc. Rule 8009(a)(2) Designation of Additional Item

5 #1

Exhibit Motion To Transfer 2:17-cv-02067-SHL-dkv

#5

(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Reassign Case Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Jon P. McCalla filed by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion To Transfer 2:17-cv-02067-SHL-dkv, #2 Exhibit Order Denying Motion To Transfer 2:17-cv-02067-SHL-dkv)(Tennison, Kathy) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

15 #2

Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appellant and Appellee Designation of Record to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennesssee (Attachments: #1 Appellee Tennison Brothers, Inc. Rule 8009(a)(2) Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record, #2 Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues)(csf) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#9

(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Jon P. McCalla filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answers to Amended Complaint))(Thomas, William) (Entered: 11/25/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER DENYING #12 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REPLY. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/28/2018. (shl) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Extend Deadline Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF #3) in Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Tennison, Kathy) (Entered: 11/25/2018)

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Response in Opposition to Motion To Modify Scheduling Order filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William) (Entered: 11/25/2018)

#12

(#12) *Motion* filed as NOTICE by William H. Thomas, Jr re #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, Request for Permission to File Reply to Response of Tennison Brothers, Inc. (ECF No. 5) (Thomas, William) *Modified on 11/28/2018 to change event to "Motion" (jae). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#16

(#16) Appellant's BRIEF by William H. Thomas, Jr. Appellee Brief due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answer to Amended Complaint))(Thomas, William) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING IN PART #6 MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/26/2018. (shl) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

16 #2

Exhibit B (Answer to Amended Complaint)

16 #1

Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint)

#17

(#17) Appellee's BRIEF by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Tennison, Kathy) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Appellee's BRIEF by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Tennison, Kathy) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Appellant's BRIEF by William H. Thomas, Jr. Appellee Brief due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answer to Amended Complaint))(Thomas, William) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appellant and Appellee Designation of Record to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennesssee (Attachments: #1 Appellee Tennison Brothers, Inc. Rule 8009(a)(2) Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record, #2 Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues)(csf) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER DENYING #12 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REPLY. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/28/2018. (shl) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #12 Notice (Other) filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. has been filed. For future reference, please note: Document should have been submitted as a motion, allowing the judge to make a ruling on the request. The event will be changed to "Motion". Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) *Motion* filed as NOTICE by William H. Thomas, Jr re #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, Request for Permission to File Reply to Response of Tennison Brothers, Inc. (ECF No. 5) (Thomas, William) *Modified on 11/28/2018 to change event to "Motion" (jae). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING IN PART #6 MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/26/2018. (shl) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Response in Opposition to Motion To Modify Scheduling Order filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William) (Entered: 11/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Jon P. McCalla filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answers to Amended Complaint))(Thomas, William) (Entered: 11/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Tennison, Kathy) (Entered: 11/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Extend Deadline Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF #3) in Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Tennison, Kathy) (Entered: 11/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Extend Deadline Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF #3) in Bankruptcy Appeal by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Reassign Case Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Jon P. McCalla filed by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion To Transfer 2:17-cv-02067-SHL-dkv, #2 Exhibit Order Denying Motion To Transfer 2:17-cv-02067-SHL-dkv)(Tennison, Kathy) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Reassign Case Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Jon P. McCalla by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Suppport of Motion to Transfer Case)(Thomas, William) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING IN BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2018. (csf) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-27850 (Adversary No. 16-00261). File received, filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. Appellant Brief due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Referral of Appeal (Correct Chapter), #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 Request by Appellant for Referral of Appeal as a Related Case to U.S. District Court Judge Jon McCalla, #4 Memorandum and Order on Plaintiffs' Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7056 Motions for Summary Judgment Combined with Notice of the Entry Thereof, #5 Defendant's Emergency Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal, #6 Response In Opposition to Defendant's Emergency Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal, #7 Order Granting Debtor's Emergency Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal, #8 Judicial Cards)(csf) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.