This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:36:27 (UTC).

Miller v. Roden (PLR1)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Miller filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Roden PLR1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00325

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Miller Thomas

Thomas Miller

Defendants

Stanley F Roden

Stanley F. Roden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan C Lee

Attorney at Alan C. Lee, Attorney

Post Office Box 1357

Talbott, TN 37877-1357

Defendant Attorney

James S McDearman

Attorney at Grant, Konvalinka & Harrison, PC

633 Chestnut Street, Suite 900 One Republic Centre

Chattanooga, TN 37450

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Thomas Miller (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/1/18. (JBR) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

7 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#7

(#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stanley F. Roden.(McDearman, James) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Stanley F Roden. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

1 #6

Summons - Roden

1 #5

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - NFC, Inc. Contract

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Roden response ltr

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff dispute ltr

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Coll Lawsuit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3739593.), filed by Thomas Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Coll Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff dispute ltr, #3 Exhibit 3 - Roden response ltr, #4 Exhibit 4 - NFC, Inc. Contract, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Roden)(Lee, Alan) Modified to correct Plaintiff's name on 8/13/2018 (BJL, ). (Entered: 08/09/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Thomas Miller (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/1/18. (JBR) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stanley F. Roden.(McDearman, James) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Stanley F Roden. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3739593.), filed by Thomas Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Coll Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff dispute ltr, #3 Exhibit 3 - Roden response ltr, #4 Exhibit 4 - NFC, Inc. Contract, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Roden)(Lee, Alan) Modified to correct Plaintiff's name on 8/13/2018 (BJL, ). (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less