This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2019 at 07:49:49 (UTC).

Thomas v. Privett Management Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 Thomas filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Privett Management Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02771

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laquita Thomas

Defendants

Wagner DaRosa

Privett Management Group, Inc.

Dania Management Group, Inc.

Memphis Donuts, LLC

Kenneth J. Privett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Paula Rachelle Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Nathaniel Andrew Bishop

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

362 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A- Laquita Thomas Consent to Join

8 #3

Kenneth Privett

8 #4

Wagner DaRosa

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Dania Mgmt Group, #2 Mphs Donuts, #3 Kenneth Privett, #4 Wagner DaRosa)(jae) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Rachelle Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Paula) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

1 #7

Summons Wagner DaRosa Summons to be Issued

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons Dania Management Group, Inc. Summons to be Issued

#2

(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

1 #4

Summons Privett Management Group, Inc. Summons to be Issued

1 #5

Summons Memphis Donuts, LLC Summons to be Issued

1 #6

Summons Kenneth Privett Summons to be Issued

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Andrew Bishop on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bishop, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

8 #2

Mphs Donuts

#11

(#11) Notice of Correction to #10 Notice of Appearance . (Jackson, Paula) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

8 #1

Dania Mgmt Group

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice of Correction to #10 Notice of Appearance . (Jackson, Paula) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Rachelle Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Paula) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Andrew Bishop on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bishop, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Dania Mgmt Group, #2 Mphs Donuts, #3 Kenneth Privett, #4 Wagner DaRosa)(jae) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2919305), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Laquita Thomas Consent to Join, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Dania Management Group, Inc. Summons to be Issued, #4 Summons Privett Management Group, Inc. Summons to be Issued, #5 Summons Memphis Donuts, LLC Summons to be Issued, #6 Summons Kenneth Privett Summons to be Issued, #7 Summons Wagner DaRosa Summons to be Issued)(Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.