This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2019 at 08:01:27 (UTC).

Thibodeaux v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Thibodeaux filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-11122

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald M Thibodeaux

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production, Inc.

Triton Asset Leasing GmbH

Sperry Drilling Services, Inc.

BP PLC

Transocean Holdings, LLC

BP America Production Company

Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.

Halliburton Energy Service, Inc.

Transocean LTD

Patrick A Juneau

Transocean Deepwater, Inc.

BP p.l.c.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodi F. Rispone

Attorney at Rodi F. Rispone, Attorney at Law

19322 S. Lakeway Ave.

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

 

Court Documents

12 #8

Summons

12 #7

Summons

12 #6

Summons

12 #5

Summons

12 #4

Summons

12 #3

Summons

12 #2

Summons

12 #1

Summons

#12

11 #8

Summons Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling

11 #7

Summons Transocean LTD

11 #6

Summons to Transocean Holdings LLC

11 #5

Summons to Transocean Deepwater Inc.

11 #4

Summons to Sperry Drilling Services LLC

11 #3

Summons Halliburton Energy Services Inc

11 #2

Summons to BP PLC

11 #1

Summons to BP Exploration & Production Inc

#11

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP p.l.c., Halliburton Energy Service, Inc., Sperry Drilling Services, Inc., Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Holdings, LLC, Transocean LTD, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(cg) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons to BP Exploration & Production Inc, #2 Summons to BP PLC, #3 Summons Halliburton Energy Services Inc, #4 Summons to Sperry Drilling Services LLC, #5 Summons to Transocean Deepwater Inc., #6 Summons to Transocean Holdings LLC, #7 Summons Transocean LTD, #8 Summons Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling)(Rispone, Rodi) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Statement by Donald M Thibodeaux re Damages and Causation per PTO 65 (Rispone, Rodi) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement by Donald M Thibodeaux re General Maritime Claim per PTO 64 (Rispone, Rodi) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons to BP Exploration and Production, Inc., #2 Summons to BP PLC, #3 Summons to Haliburton Energy Services, Inc., #4 Summons to Sperry Drilling Services, Inc., #5 Summons to Transocean Deepwater, Inc., #6 Summons to Transocean Holdings, LLC, #7 Summons to Transocean LTD, #8 Summons to Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.)(Rispone, Rodi) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013. (gec) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, & #41 2nd Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO #11, #2 PTO #12 1st Amended, #3 PTO #25, #4 PTO #31, #5 PTO #41 2nd Amended)(gec) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Patrick A Juneau. (gec) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Civil Cover Sheet was incorrectly filed as the main document. Clerk reattached documents so that the complaint appears as the main document and the civil cover sheet is an attachment. ALSO, attached summons does not reflect complete heading/caption and name and address of plaintiff's attorney. All future complaints and summons submitted for issuance must be filed this way. (gec) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketFiling fee received from Donald M Thibodeaux: receipt LAE052994 $400 (cc) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Docket(#2) Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $400 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (cc) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Donald M Thibodeaux. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Summons)Attorney Rodi F. Rispone added to party Donald M Thibodeaux(pty:pla).(Rispone, Rodi) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/19/2018) (gec). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2018) (gec). Modified on 11/19/2018 (gec). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sperry Drilling Services, a division of Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSOCEAN, LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where Transocean Holdings, LLC is a litigant