This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2018 at 07:28:10 (UTC).

Theriot #423068 v. Woods et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 Theriot 423068 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Woods. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon J. Quist, Timothy P. Greeley and Ray Kent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00193

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon J. Quist

Referral Judges

Timothy P. Greeley

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Defendants

Unknown Velma

Unknown Phillips

Unknown Dalotts

Unknown Duecetti

Unknown Ledare

Unknown Skytta

Unknown Bessner

Daniel Lesatz

Thomas Mackie

Unknown Vitteleo

Rick Snyder

Unknown Marshall

Unknown Meals

Unknown Fliccano

Unknown Bray

Unknown Miller

Robert Napel

Unknown Spruie

Unknown Latnen

Joseph O'Leary

53 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as duplicative and frivolous; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for an appeal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER denying as moot #3 motion for preliminary injunction; denying as moot #3 motion for TRO; denying as moot #4 motion to expedite; denying as moot #6 motion to appoint counsel ; denying as moot #7 motion to produce; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#12

(#12) OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $6.24 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

20 #2

Summons

20 #1

Affidavit

#20

(#20) AFFIDAVIT ("of Kevin Theriot to Defendants") by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Summons) (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) AFFIDAVIT re #3 by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion to Expedite #4 filed by Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (mlc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#4

(#18) AFFIDAVIT re #4 by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

3 #2

Affidavit of Kevin Theriot

3 #1

Argument in Support of Injunction

#3

(#19) AFFIDAVIT re #3 by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

2 #1

Financial Documents

#2

(#17) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit C - MDOC Parole Eligibility Reports

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - MDOC Parole Eligibility Reports) (mlc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $6.24, receipt number MQ005669; amount paid to date $6.24 (slk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #14 , Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #11 , Opinion (Screening) #12 , Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Produce, #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Dwayne Theriot (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as duplicative and frivolous; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for an appeal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER denying as moot #3 motion for preliminary injunction; denying as moot #3 motion for TRO; denying as moot #4 motion to expedite; denying as moot #6 motion to appoint counsel ; denying as moot #7 motion to produce; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $6.24 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) AFFIDAVIT ("of Kevin Theriot to Defendants") by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Summons) (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) AFFIDAVIT re #3 by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AFFIDAVIT re #4 by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (mlc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE that the Clerk has randomly selected Magistrate Judge Ray Kent to be available in the event any non-dispositive pretrial matters are referred for determination under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) re #9 (mlc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley is recused from this case; case to be reassigned ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER from plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 requesting docket sheet; and forms (mailed docket sheet with requested 1983 forms to plaintiff) (mlc) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to produce named as, "Motion for Help with Full Names" by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068; (mlc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDOC Expedited Legal Mail Forms (CSJ-318), #2 Exhibit B - Letter from James Sterling Lawrence Attorney at Law) (mlc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion to Expedite #4 filed by Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (mlc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to expedite Consideration by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068; (mlc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for preliminary injunction , MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068; (Attachments: #1 Argument in Support of Injunction, #2 Affidavit of Kevin Theriot) (mlc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Kevin Dwayne Theriot #423068 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - MDOC Parole Eligibility Reports) (mlc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less