This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2018 at 05:58:28 (UTC).

Theis v. Deere & Co.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 Theis filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Deere Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sara Darrow and Jonathan E. Hawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04038

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lori Theis

Defendant

Deere & Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Bartolic

Attorney at ROBERTS BARTOLIC LLP

Suite 1420, 208 South Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Hillary August

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Sari M Alamuddin

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

Suite 500, 77 W Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

17 #1

*Restricted*

#17

(#17) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-08979. . (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#16

(#16) TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois the electronic record (sxb, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER: Defendant's unopposed motion to transfer venue to the Central District of Illinois #12 is granted. This case is hereby transferred to the Central District of Illinois under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The motion hearing set for 2/20/2018, the status report filing date of 2/21/2018, and the status hearing set for 2/27/2018 are stricken. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 2/13/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Motion by Sari M. Alamuddin for presentment of motion to transfer case #12 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 2/20/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

13 #1

Exhibit A - Decl. of Amber Davis in Support of Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venu

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM by Deere & Co. in support of motion to transfer case #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decl. of Amber Davis in Support of Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue)(Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Defendant Deere & Co. to transfer case Unopposed (Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Deere & Co. (Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Deere & Co.(Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deere & Co. by Hillary August (August, Hillary) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deere & Co. by Sari M. Alamuddin (Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 2/21/2018. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 2/27/2018 at 9:45 a.m.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lori Theis. Deere & Co. waiver sent on 12/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018. (Bartolic, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#4

(#4) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Deere & Co. on 12/14/2017 by Plaintiff Lori Theis. Waiver of service due by 1/16/2018. (Bartolic, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lori Theis by Michael Bartolic (Bartolic, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bartolic, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-08979. . (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois the electronic record (sxb, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (sxb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: Defendant's unopposed motion to transfer venue to the Central District of Illinois #12 is granted. This case is hereby transferred to the Central District of Illinois under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The motion hearing set for 2/20/2018, the status report filing date of 2/21/2018, and the status hearing set for 2/27/2018 are stricken. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 2/13/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Motion by Sari M. Alamuddin for presentment of motion to transfer case #12 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 2/20/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMORANDUM by Deere & Co. in support of motion to transfer case #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decl. of Amber Davis in Support of Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue)(Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION by Defendant Deere & Co. to transfer case Unopposed (Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Deere & Co. (Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Deere & Co.(Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deere & Co. by Hillary August (August, Hillary) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deere & Co. by Sari M. Alamuddin (Alamuddin, Sari) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 2/21/2018. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 2/27/2018 at 9:45 a.m.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lori Theis. Deere & Co. waiver sent on 12/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018. (Bartolic, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Deere & Co. on 12/14/2017 by Plaintiff Lori Theis. Waiver of service due by 1/16/2018. (Bartolic, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (kb, ) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lori Theis by Michael Bartolic (Bartolic, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bartolic, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lori Theis; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13907560. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Plan Document)(Bartolic, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less