This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 13:09:34 (UTC).

The United States of America et al v. Granite Re et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 The United States of America filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Granite Re. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Morris. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-CV-00065

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The United States of America

Yellowstone Electric Co.

Defendants

Granite Re

Mountain Movers / Ainsworth-Benning

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelsey E. Bunkers

John M. Mastin, Jr.

Matthew F. McLean

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph A. Nilan

Michael L. Rausch

 

Court Documents

#14

#25

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting 22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel A. Ellerbrock for Granite Re. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/28/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/13/2017. (MMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph A. Nilan. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/11/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/27/2017. (Copy of order mailed to Counsel Nilan) (MMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Granite Re Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L. Rausch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph A. Nilan