This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2018 at 07:31:17 (UTC).

The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. Klee et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Klee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candace J. Smith and David L. Bunning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00175

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

Respondents

Lisa Klee

Kent Klee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Stephen Keller

Attorney at Schiller Barnes Maloney PLLC

401 W. Main Street, One River Front Plaza, Suite 1600

Louisville, KY 40202

Michael S. Maloney

Attorney at Schiller Barnes Maloney PLLC

401 W. Main Street, One River Front Plaza, Suite 1600

Louisville, KY 40202

Respondent Attorney

Clinton H. Scott

Attorney at Gilbert Russell McWherter PLC

101 N. Highland

Jackson, TN 38301

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER: 1. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 12/6/2018 at 03:30 PM in COVINGTON before Judge David L. Bunning. Parties to dial in to this conference 5 minutes before the scheduled time by following steps 1 and 2 of this Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/29/2018.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#13

(#13) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation on Appointing Umpire and Staying Case by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#12

(#12) JOINT MOTION to Stay by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee Proceedings and to Appoint Umpire Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER: 1. Granting #9 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive pleading. 2. Respondent's Responsive pleading to the Petition to Appoint Umpire shall be due by 11/27/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/9/2018. (LST)cc: COR (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#10

(#10) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Lisa Klee on 10/16/2018, filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Maloney, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summon served on Kent Klee on 10/16/2018, filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Maloney, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Kent Klee, Lisa Klee; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (ECO) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons to Kent Klee

1 #2

Exhibit B-Umpire Bios

1 #1

Exhibit A-Insurance Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4183200), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B-Umpire Bios, #3 Summons to Kent Klee, #4 Summons to Lisa Klee, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: 1. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 12/6/2018 at 03:30 PM in COVINGTON before Judge David L. Bunning. Parties to dial in to this conference 5 minutes before the scheduled time by following steps 1 and 2 of this Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/29/2018.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re #13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation on Appointing Umpire and Staying Case by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee, #12 JOINT MOTION to Stay by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee Proceedings and to Appoint Umpire (LST) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation on Appointing Umpire and Staying Case by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT MOTION to Stay by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee Proceedings and to Appoint Umpire Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: 1. Granting #9 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive pleading. 2. Respondent's Responsive pleading to the Petition to Appoint Umpire shall be due by 11/27/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/9/2018. (LST)cc: COR (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kent Klee, Lisa Klee. (Scott, Clinton) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Lisa Klee on 10/16/2018, filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Maloney, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summon served on Kent Klee on 10/16/2018, filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Maloney, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Kent Klee, Lisa Klee; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (ECO) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4183200), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B-Umpire Bios, #3 Summons to Kent Klee, #4 Summons to Lisa Klee, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.