This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2018 at 07:43:31 (UTC).

THE RENCO GROUP, INC. et al v. STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 THE RENCO GROUP, INC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert C. Mitchell and Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01311

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert C. Mitchell

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

US MAGNESIUM LLC

ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC

UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC.

INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC

THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION

THE RENCO GROUP, INC.

BLUE TURTLES, INC.

Defendant

STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anderson T. Bailey

Attorney at Jones Day

500 Grant Street, One Mellon Center, Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Leon F. DeJulius

Attorney at Jones Day

500 Grant Street, One Mellon Center, Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Myron D. Rumeld

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Joseph E. Clark

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Bradley R. Bobroff

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NE 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Neil J. Gregorio

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg

1500 One Ppg Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Bradley S. Tupi

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg

1500 One Ppg Place, 594-5545

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Scott R. Leah

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg

1500 One Ppg Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Brian A. Pepicelli

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg, P.C.

1500 One Ppg Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Richard B. Tucker, III

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg

1500 One Ppg Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Proposed Order

18 #1

Affidavit of Myron D. Rumeld

#18

(#18) MOTION for attorney Myron D. Rumeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4947103) by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Myron D. Rumeld, #2 Proposed Order) (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Affidavit of Joseph E. Clark

#17

(#17) MOTION for attorney Joseph E. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4947090) by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph E. Clark, #2 Proposed Order) (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Affidavit of Bradley R. Bobroff

#16

(#16) MOTION for attorney Bradley R. Bobroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4946895) by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bradley R. Bobroff, #2 Proposed Order) (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. (Bailey, Anderson) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#4

(#4) BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases, filed by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#8) BRIEF in Opposition re #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases, filed by STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST. (Gregorio, Neil) Modified on 10/11/2018. (jjg) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST (jjg) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4881722), filed by THE RENCO GROUP, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, BLUE TURTLES, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC, UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (jjg) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Myron D. Rumeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 11/29/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Joseph E. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 11/29/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Bradley R. Bobroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 11/29/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for attorney Myron D. Rumeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4947103) by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Myron D. Rumeld, #2 Proposed Order) (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for attorney Joseph E. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4947090) by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph E. Clark, #2 Proposed Order) (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for attorney Bradley R. Bobroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4946895) by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bradley R. Bobroff, #2 Proposed Order) (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell referred. Motions referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (av) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell no longer assigned to case. Error. (av) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell referred. Motions referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (av) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Judge Cathy Bissoon now presiding. Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell no longer assigned to case. (av) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Neil J. Gregorio on behalf of STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST. (Gregorio, Neil) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEF in Opposition re #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases, filed by STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST. (Gregorio, Neil) Modified on 10/11/2018. (jjg) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE RENCO GROUP, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, BLUE TURTLES, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC, UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC. All Defendants. (Bailey, Anderson) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. (Bailey, Anderson) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases: Response to Motion due by 10/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 10/4/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases, filed by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by BLUE TURTLES, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC, THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, THE RENCO GROUP, INC., UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell added. Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer assigned to case. (jjg) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST (jjg) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4881722), filed by THE RENCO GROUP, INC., ILSHAR CAPITAL LLC, BLUE TURTLES, INC., US MAGNESIUM LLC, UNARCO MATERIAL HANDLING, INC., THE DOE RUN RESOURCES CORPORATION, INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (jjg) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEVA PRODUCTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Renco Group, Inc., The is a litigant