This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2018 at 06:28:38 (UTC).

The Regents of the University of California et al v. Affymetrix, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 The Regents of the University of California filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Affymetrix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nita L. Stormes and Marilyn L. Huff. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-01394

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nita L. Stormes

Presiding Judge

Marilyn L. Huff

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Becton, Dickinson and Company

The Regents of the University of California

Defendants

Affymetrix, Inc.

Life Technologies Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barbara A. Fiacco

Thomas Jesse Hindman

Marco Johnson Quina

Donald Ross Ware

Lucas Paul Watkins

Defendant Attorneys

Roger J Chin

Brenda L. Danek

Jeffrey Gerard Homrig

Douglas E. Lumish

Nathanial J. McPherson

 

Court Documents

#85

(#85) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for an Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information [Doc. No. 80 ]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/22/2017. (jjg)

#79

(#79) ORDER Granting 78 Joint Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/15/2017. (jjg)

#76

(#76) (1) Order Granting Joint Motion to Advance Claim Construction Schedule; and (2) Amended Scheduling Order [Doc. No. 75 ]. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/23/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/30/2017. (jjg)

#69

(#69) ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [Doc. No. 8 ]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/20/2017. (jjg)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for an Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information [Doc. No. 80 ]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/22/2017. (jjg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) ORDER Granting 78 Joint Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/15/2017. (jjg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) (1) Order Granting Joint Motion to Advance Claim Construction Schedule; and (2) Amended Scheduling Order [Doc. No. 75 ]. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/23/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/30/2017. (jjg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [Doc. No. 8 ]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/20/2017. (jjg)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Technologies Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Affymetrix, Inc., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Becton Dickinson Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant