This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2019 at 08:03:41 (UTC).

The Government of Puerto Rico v. The Carpenter Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 The Government of Puerto Rico filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against The Carpenter Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gustavo A. Gelpi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01987

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gustavo A. Gelpi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Government of Puerto Rico

Defendants

Vitafoam Products Canada, Limited

David Carson

Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies, Inc.

The Carpenter Company

Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.

Mohawk Industries, Inc.

Future Foam, Inc.

Flexible Foam Products, Inc.

Leggett & Platt, Inc.

Woodbridge Foam Corporation

Vitafoam, Inc.

Scottdel, Inc.

FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.

Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co.

Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc.

Louis Carson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jane A. Becker-Whitaker

Attorney at Becker & Vissepo

Po Box 9023914

San Juan, PR 00902-3914

Denise Maldonado-Rosa

Attorney at Puerto Rico Department of Justice

P.O. Box 9020192

San Juan, PR 00902-0192

Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga

Attorney at Vissepo Law Group, P.S.C.

Po Box 367116

San Juan, PR 00936-7116

Defendant Attorney

Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges, LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918

 

Court Documents

#17

1 #18

Summons

1 #17

Summons

1 #16

Summons

1 #15

Summons

1 #14

Summons

1 #13

Summons

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: Granting as requested #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/14/2019. (LE) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/18/2019 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Respond re: #1 Complaint, filed by The Government of Puerto Rico filed by Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., The Carpenter Company, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. Responses due by 2/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hernandez-Gonzalez, Arturo) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ***FILED IN ERROR***ORDER: Granting as requested #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/13/2019. (LE) Modified on 2/13/2019 (gmm). (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/18/2019 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., The Carpenter Company, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** (ab) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ***FILED IN ERROR*** Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/18/2019 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Respond re: #1 Complaint, filed by The Government of Puerto Rico filed by Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., The Carpenter Company, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. Responses due by 2/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hernandez-Gonzalez, Arturo) Modified on 2/13/2019 (ab). (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Leggett & Platt, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 2/13/2019 to edit title (gmm). (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Mohawk Industries, Inc. served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed Proof of Service by All Plaintiffs upon Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed Proof of Service Carpenter Company by All Plaintiffs upon The Carpenter Company served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed Proof of Service by All Plaintiffs upon FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Government of Puerto Rico upon Vitafoam, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Mohawk Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Louis Carson, David Carson, FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Flexible Foam Products, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies, Inc., Scottdel, Inc., The Carpenter Company, Vitafoam Products Canada, Limited, Vitafoam, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Noted #4 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/21/2018. (LE) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. (rim) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6195681.), filed by The Government of Puerto Rico. Service due by 3/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(Maldonado-Rosa, Denise) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc. is a litigant