This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 22:11:44 (UTC).

The Estate of Bonell Rashti v. Bank of America National Association et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 The Estate of Bonell Rashti filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Bank of America National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01101

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Estate of Bonell Rashti

Defendants

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

BRIT Insurance

Bank of New York Mellon

Great Lakes Reinsurance (U.K.) PLC

Bank of America National Association

Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London

QBE Americas, Inc.

The Bank of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy T. Mitchell

Attorney at Rashti and Mitchell

4422 Ridgeside Drive

Dallas, TX 75244

Donna Kaye Rashti

Attorney at Rashti and Mitchell

4422 Ridgeside Dr

Dallas, TX 75244

Timothy Toyn Mitchell

Attorney at Rashti and Mitchell

4422 Ridgeside Drive

Dallas, TX 75244

Defendant Attorneys

Jason R Bernhardt

Attorney at Winstead, PC

600 Travis Street, Suite 5200

Houston, TX 77002

Joshua Henry Bauer

Attorney at Dykema Cox Smith

1717 Main St., Ste 4200

Dallas, TX 75201

Gerard Joseph Kimmitt, II

Attorney at HFW

5151 San Felipe, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77056

Sheshe Taylor Evans

Attorney at Holman Fenwick Willan

5151 San Felipe, Ste 400

Houston, TX 77056

Kathryn Buza Davis

Attorney at Winston and Strawn

1111 Louisiana Street, 25Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph Ray Little

Attorney at The Little Law Firm

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#125

(#125) Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #124 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#124

RESTRICTED

#123

(#123) Order of USCA re: #120 Notice of Appeal, #104 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 18-20539. The court has granted the motion to supplement or correct the record in this case. The originating court is requested to provide a supplemental electronic record consisting of the documents outlined in the attached motion. Additionally, the court has granted an extension of time to and including January 30, 2019 for filing appellant's brief in this case, filed.(jtabares, 1) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#122

(#122) DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Timothy T. Mitchell. This is to order a transcript of 9/4/2018 Conference before Judge Hughes. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Dye. This order form relates to the following: #112 Pretrial Conference,, filed.(Mitchell, Timothy) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#120

Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 18-20539 re: #120 Notice of Appeal, filed.(dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#112

(#122) DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Timothy T. Mitchell. This is to order a transcript of 9/4/2018 Conference before Judge Hughes. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Dye. This order form relates to the following: #112 Pretrial Conference,, filed.(Mitchell, Timothy) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#104

Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #104 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 18-20539, filed.(dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #15

Exhibit(s)

1 #11

Exhibit(s)

1 #10

Exhibit(s)

1 #9

Exhibit(s)

1 #7

Exhibit(s)

1 #6

Exhibit(s)

1 #5

Exhibit(s)

1 #4

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

192 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #104 Notice of Appeal, #120 Notice of Appeal to Andrew J. Schumacher, counsel for Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20539), filed.(jtabares, 1) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Access to Supplemental #2 Record on Appeal Provided re: #104 Notice of Appeal, #120 Notice of Appeal to Jason Bernhardt; Connie Jones & Timothy Mitchell. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20539), filed.(dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplemental #2 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #120 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 18--20539, filed.(dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#125) Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #124 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#124) APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re: Conference held on September 4, 2018, before Judge Lynn N Hughes. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye. Ordering Party Donna Kaye Rashti Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2019., filed. (gdye, ) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#123) Order of USCA re: #120 Notice of Appeal, #104 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 18-20539. The court has granted the motion to supplement or correct the record in this case. The originating court is requested to provide a supplemental electronic record consisting of the documents outlined in the attached motion. Additionally, the court has granted an extension of time to and including January 30, 2019 for filing appellant's brief in this case, filed.(jtabares, 1) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Timothy T. Mitchell. This is to order a transcript of 9/4/2018 Conference before Judge Hughes. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Dye. This order form relates to the following: #112 Pretrial Conference,, filed.(Mitchell, Timothy) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 18-20539 re: #120 Notice of Appeal, filed.(dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #104 Notice of Appeal to Jason Ryan Bernhardt; Connie Flores Jones & Timothy Mitchell. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20539), filed.(dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #104 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 18-20539, filed.(dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London (Evans, Sheshe) Modified on 6/22/2017 to reflect amended.(svc). (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Eliminate the Face-to-face Requirement for the Preparation of the Joint Report of Meeting and Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan under Rule 26(f) Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by The Estate of Bonell Rashti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Timothy) Modified text to match document title on 6/21/2017 (rekc). (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Estate of Bonell Rashti. (Mitchell, Timothy) (Entered: 06/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/6/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/8/2017) (epm) (Entered: 06/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: Defendant QBE Americas Inc's fails to allege properly the citizenship of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. Until QBE properly alleges the citizenship of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, this court is not shown to have subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/8/2017) (epm) (Entered: 06/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Sheshe Taylor Evans added to party Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC(pty:dft) (Evans, Sheshe) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by BRIT Insurance, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Sheshe Taylor Evans added to party BRIT Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Sheshe Taylor Evans added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London(pty:dft) (Evans, Sheshe) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental Document by Bank of New York Mellon, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC as to #1 Notice of Removal and Notice of Appearance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Bernhardt, Jason) (Entered: 05/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) (Entered: 05/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 95th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-17-04160 filed by QBE Americas Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8398686) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s)) (Little, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE UK PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIT 2987 is a litigant

Latest cases where QBE Americas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant