This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2019 at 17:24:02 (UTC).

The County of Beaver v. Bank Of America Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2014 The County of Beaver filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bank Of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jesse M. Furman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-07907

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The County of Beaver

Defendants

UBS AG

BNP Paribas SA

Nomura Securities International, Inc.

HSBC Bank PLC

Credit Suisse AG, New York Branch

Bank Of America Corporation

JPMorgan Chase & Co.

ICAP plc

Deutsche Bank AG

Barclays Bank PLC

Royal Bank of Scotland PLC

CitiGroup Inc.

Goldman, Sachs & Co.

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

ICAP Capital Markets, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sylvia Sokol

Attorney at Scott + Scott, L.L.P.( NYC)

230 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

David R. Scott

Attorney at Scott & Scott, LLC(CT)

156 South Main Street, P.O.Box 192

Colchester, CT 06415

David W. Mitchell

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP (SANDIEGO)

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Daniel Lawrence Brockett

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Steig Olson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Christopher M. Burke

Attorney at Scott + Scott, L.L.P.( NYC)

230 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

Patrick Joseph Coughlin

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Ronald Judah Aranoff

Attorney at Bernstein Liebhard, LLP

10 East 40Th Street

New York, NY 10016

Thomas Kay Boardman

Attorney at Scott + Scott, L.L.P.( NYC)

230 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

Marc Laurence Greenwald

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Neda Vegari

Attorney at Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Brian Howard Polovoy

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP (NY)

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Andrew L. Fish

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

3 World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

Gregory Thomas Casamento

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP (NYC)

3 World Financial Center, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Jay B. Kasner

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Andrew Christopher Kostic

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Eric Jonathan Seiler

Attorney at Friedman, Kaplan,Seiler & Adelman, LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Anne Elizabeth Beaumont

Attorney at Friedman, Kaplan,Seiler & Adelman, LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Brian S. Fraser

Attorney at Akerman LLP

666 Fifth Avenue, Ste 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10103

Shari A. Brandt

Attorney at Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP (NYC)

200 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10281-1003

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#115

(#115) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Daniel L. Brockett dated July 20, 2017. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Erste Abwicklungsanstalt (EAA), Genesee County Employees' Retirement System, Pennsylvania Turnpike Commission, Portigon AG, The City of New Britain, The County of Montgomery, The County of Washington.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 1:14-cv-08342-JMF, 1:14-cv-08365-JMF, 1:14-cv-08576-JMF(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

#112

(#112) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/10/2017 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2017.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 1:14-cv-08342-JMF, 1:14-cv-08365-JMF, 1:14-cv-08576-JMF(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2017)

#111

(#111) ORDER: On November 3, 2014, the Court entered an Order consolidating the five related cases in this matter (14-CV-7126, 14-CV-7907, 14-CV-8342, 14-CV-8365, and 14-CV-8576) under the lead case, 14-CV-7126. (Docket No. 109). To fully effect the intent of that Order and to ensure the docket is maintained in an orderly fashion the Clerk of Court is directed to close all of the related cases (that is, to close all cases except 14-CV-7126). The parties shall make all future filings solely on the 14-CV-7126 docket. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/4/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 1:14-cv-08342-JMF, 1:14-cv-08365-JMF, 1:14-cv-08576-JMF(ras) (Entered: 05/04/2017)

104 #8

Exhibit 8

104 #5

Exhibit 5

#87

No Description Available

#84

No Description Available

80 #4

Exhibit D

80 #2

Exhibit B

#72

No Description Available

63 #128

No Description Available

#56

No Description Available

#55

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (moh) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

146 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#117) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney James L. Brochin terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/23/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 1:14-cv-08342-JMF, 1:14-cv-08365-JMF, 1:14-cv-08576-JMF. (ras) (Entered: 10/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#116) ORDER terminating #115 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The parties are reminded that, per Docket No. 439 in 14-CV-7126, all filings relating to this case at to be made "solely on the 14-CV-7126 docket." (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#115) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Daniel L. Brockett dated July 20, 2017. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Erste Abwicklungsanstalt (EAA), Genesee County Employees' Retirement System, Pennsylvania Turnpike Commission, Portigon AG, The City of New Britain, The County of Montgomery, The County of Washington.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 1:14-cv-08342-JMF, 1:14-cv-08365-JMF, 1:14-cv-08576-JMF(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (113 in 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 486 in 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP) Notice (Other) filed by Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., (Attorney Thomas Mcauley Leineweber terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/11/17) (yv) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Thomas M. Leineweber. Document filed by Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF(Leineweber, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/10/2017 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2017.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 1:14-cv-08342-JMF, 1:14-cv-08365-JMF, 1:14-cv-08576-JMF(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) ORDER: On November 3, 2014, the Court entered an Order consolidating the five related cases in this matter (14-CV-7126, 14-CV-7907, 14-CV-8342, 14-CV-8365, and 14-CV-8576) under the lead case, 14-CV-7126. (Docket No. 109). To fully effect the intent of that Order and to ensure the docket is maintained in an orderly fashion the Clerk of Court is directed to close all of the related cases (that is, to close all cases except 14-CV-7126). The parties shall make all future filings solely on the 14-CV-7126 docket. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/4/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 1:14-cv-08342-JMF, 1:14-cv-08365-JMF, 1:14-cv-08576-JMF(ras) (Entered: 05/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#110) ORDER terminating (413) Motion to Seal Document; terminating (434) Letter Motion to Compel; terminating (436) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP; terminating (105) Motion to Seal Document; terminating (109) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:14-cv-07907-JMF; terminating (65) Motion to Seal Document; terminating (69) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:14-cv-08342-JMF; terminating (50) Motion to Seal Document; terminating (54) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:14-cv-08365-JMF; terminating (49) Motion to Seal Document; terminating (53) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:14-cv-08576-JMF. Upon review of the most recent letters from Plaintiffs and Morgan Stanley, and in view of the history of those parties' disputes, the Court is persuaded that there is a need for more rigorous scrutiny of Morgan Stanley's production. To that end, by separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring the parties' dispute to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (To be clear, the referral is limited to the production disputes between Plaintiffs and Morgan Stanley.) Counsel for Plaintiffs and Morgan Stanley shall contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Peck no later than May 5, 2017. All other dates and deadlines remain the same.The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket Nos. 434 and 436 in Docket 14-CV-7126; Docket No. 109 in Docket 14-CV-7097; Docket No. 54 in Docket 14-CV-8365; Docket No. 53 in Docket 14-CV-8576; and Docket No. 69 in Docket 14-CV-8342. Further, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the following motions that were previously resolved but remain open: Docket No. 413 in 14-CV-7126; Docket No. 105 in 14-CV-7907; Docket No. 65 in 14-CV-8342; Docket No. 50 in 14-CV-8365; and Docket No. 49 in 14-CV-8576. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/4/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF-AJP, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 1:14-cv-08342-JMF, 1:14-cv-08365-JMF, 1:14-cv-08576-JMF (ras) Modified on 5/10/2017 (ras). (Entered: 05/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Morgan Stanley's April 27 Letter addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Daniel L. Brockett dated May 1, 2017. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Erste Abwicklungsanstalt (EAA), Genesee County Employees' Retirement System, Pennsylvania Turnpike Commission, Portigon AG, The City of New Britain, The County of Montgomery, The County of Washington, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, on behalf of UNIQA Dollar Bond.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-07126-JMF, 1:14-cv-07907-JMF, 1:14-cv-08342-JMF, 1:14-cv-08365-JMF, 1:14-cv-08576-JMF(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) ORDER granting #107 Letter Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Non-Settling Defendants' Joint Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2014
  • Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (pgu) (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-cv-07126-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu) (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (moh) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14cv7126. Document filed by The County of Beaver.(moh) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • Case Designated ECF. (moh) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 14cv7126. (moh) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNP Paribas SA, Bank Of America Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Credit Suisse AG, New York Branch, Deutsche Bank AG, Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Bank PLC, ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (moh) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas SA, Bank Of America Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Credit Suisse AG, New York Branch, Deutsche Bank AG, Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Bank PLC, ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401106182)Document filed by The County of Beaver. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2)(moh) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.