Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/03/2017 at 02:33:15 (UTC).

The City of Fremont v. FieldTurf USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 The City of Fremont filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FieldTurf USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-07714

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CITY OF FREMONT

Defendants

FIELDTURF INC.

FIELDTURF USA INC.

FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS

In Re

FIELDTURF ARTIFICIAL TURF MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan S Elias

Attorney at Girard Gibbs LLP

601 California Street, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Angelica Maria Ornelas

Attorney at Girard Gibbs LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

DANIEL C. GIRARD

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

601 California Street, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Adam E Polk

Attorney at McNamara Law Firm

1211 Newell Ave

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

16 #1

*Restricted*

#16

(#16) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-05053. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/02/2017)

#15

(#15) CTO ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to USDC-New Jersey signed by MDL Panel. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017) (Entered: 09/29/2017)

13 #1

Declaration of Adam E. Polk

#13

(#13) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Deadline to Respond to Complaint Pending Transfer filed by The City of Fremont. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/14/2017) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The City of Fremont. Service waived by FieldTurf Tarkett SAS waiver sent on 9/13/2017, answer due 12/12/2017; FieldTurf USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2017, answer due 12/12/2017; FieldTurf, Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2017, answer due 12/12/2017. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/14/2017) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2017.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/14/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/13/17. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) (Entered: 09/13/2017)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The City of Fremont.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/31/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by The City of Fremont of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by The City of Fremont . (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc., FieldTurf, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11677425.). Filed byThe City of Fremont. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jjc) (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-05053. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CTO ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to USDC-New Jersey signed by MDL Panel. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017) (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • (#14) ORDER. At the parties' request, the deadline for FieldTurf to respond to the complaint is held in abeyance pending transfer. Upon transfer, FieldTurf will not be obligated to respond to the complaint except in accordance with the court's scheduling orders in the multidistrict litigation. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Deadline to Respond to Complaint Pending Transfer filed by The City of Fremont. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/14/2017) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The City of Fremont. Service waived by FieldTurf Tarkett SAS waiver sent on 9/13/2017, answer due 12/12/2017; FieldTurf USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2017, answer due 12/12/2017; FieldTurf, Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2017, answer due 12/12/2017. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/14/2017) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2017.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/14/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/13/17. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • (#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017) (Entered: 09/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The City of Fremont.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc., FieldTurf, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017) (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by The City of Fremont of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet by The City of Fremont . (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc., FieldTurf, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11677425.). Filed byThe City of Fremont. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIELDTURF USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angelica M. Ornelas, Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Elias

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM E. POLK