Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/02/2017 at 02:30:51 (UTC).

The City of Fremont v. FieldTurf USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 The City of Fremont filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FieldTurf USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maria-Elena James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-05053

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maria-Elena James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The City of Fremont

Defendants

FieldTurf Tarkett SAS

FieldTurf USA, Inc.

FieldTurf, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan S Elias

Attorney at Girard Gibbs LLP

601 California Street, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Angelica Maria Ornelas

Attorney at Girard Gibbs LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

Daniel C. Girard

Attorney at Girard Gibbs LLP

601 California Street, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Adam E. Polk

Attorney at Girard Gibbs LLP

601 California Street, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/31/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by The City of Fremont of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by The City of Fremont . (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc., FieldTurf, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11677425.). Filed byThe City of Fremont. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by The City of Fremont of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet by The City of Fremont . (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc., FieldTurf, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11677425.). Filed byThe City of Fremont. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIELDTURF USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angelica M. Ornelas, Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Elias

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM E. POLK