This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2019 at 22:15:43 (UTC).

The California Institute of Technology v. Broadcom Limited et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2016 The California Institute of Technology filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Broadcom Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-03714

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

The California Institute of Technology

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Broadcom Limited

Broadcom Corporation

Apple Inc.

Avago Technologies Limited

Cypress Semiconductor Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brian P Biddinger

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Kevin P B Johnson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Heather Elizabeth Belville

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Margaret Hsiao-Shia Shyr

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive 5Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94065-2138

Charles McLean Stiernberg, Jr

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Todd M Briggs

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Ron Hagiz

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Jordan R Jaffe

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

50 California Street 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Seung Woo Hur

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Lance Yang

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan LLP

865 S Figueroa Street 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Aaron Shawn Thompson

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael Hal Smith

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

James M Dowd

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Richard A Goldenberg

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Duane David Hough

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Andrew S DeCarlow

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Cliff Allan Maier

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

Two Palo Alto Square, 3000 El Camino Real Suite 300

Palo Alto, CA 94306-2112

Jason Francis Choy

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Peter E Root

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306-2112

Michael J Malecek

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

3000 El Camino Real, Building 5, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306-2112

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1367

(#1367) ORDER GRANTING CALTECHS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #1341 by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technologys (Plaintiff or Caltech) Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Caltechs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ofNoninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 (Opposition). See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#1366

(#1366) ORDER GRANTING CALTECHS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu. Having considered the papers, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Instituteof Technologys (Plaintiff or Caltech) Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Caltechs Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Copying Secondary Consideration of Non-Obviousness (CaltechsOpposition). See order for details. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

1341 #6

Proposed Order

1341 #5

Redacted Document Exhibit 6

1341 #4

Redacted Document Exhibit 5

1341 #3

Redacted Document Declaration of Dr. Shoemake

1341 #2

Redacted Document Response to Statement of Undisputed Fact

1341 #1

Redacted Document Opposition

#1341

(#1367) ORDER GRANTING CALTECHS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #1341 by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technologys (Plaintiff or Caltech) Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Caltechs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ofNoninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 (Opposition). See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#2

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Appendix 1 (Exemplary Accused Products)

#1

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (car) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

4,894 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1367) ORDER GRANTING CALTECHS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #1341 by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Institute of Technologys (Plaintiff or Caltech) Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Caltechs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ofNoninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,421,032 (Opposition). See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1366) ORDER GRANTING CALTECHS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu. Having considered the papers, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff California Instituteof Technologys (Plaintiff or Caltech) Application to File Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Caltechs Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Caltechs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Copying Secondary Consideration of Non-Obviousness (CaltechsOpposition). See order for details. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1365) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1326 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1364) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1329 BROADCOM AND APPLES MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1363) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1320 BROADCOM AND APPLE'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1362) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1331 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1361) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1345 CALTECH'E APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1360) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1347 CALTECH'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1359) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #1352 APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1358) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: #1318 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,347 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-03714 GW(AGRx). (rn) (Entered: 05/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Apple Inc., Avago Technologies Limited, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited. (car) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff California Institute of Technology. Notice of Potentially Related Cases (Asperger, James) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff California Institute of Technology, (Asperger, James) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff California Institute of Technology. (Asperger, James) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17897782 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff California Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 (Exemplary Accused Products), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Attorney James R Asperger added to party California Institute of Technology(pty:pla))(Asperger, James) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less