Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2019 at 18:02:54 (UTC).

Thakkar v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2015 Thakkar filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-10109

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nirav Thakkar

Cross Defendants, Defendants, Cross Claimants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Baxol Properties, LLC

Laudan Properties, LLC

Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A.

Altisource Solutions, Inc.

Green Group Corp.

3Rd Party Defendant and Cross Defendant

Green Group Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rusty A. Payton

20 North Clark Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

Nick Heath Wooten

Attorney at Nick Wooten, LLC

5125 Burnt Pine Drive

Conway, AR 72034

Cross Defendant, Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Denean K. Sturino

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer, LLC

One E. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

Katherine Decker

Attorney at O'hagan Meyer Llc

1 E Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

Kevin Christopher Rasp

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer, LLC

One E. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

Daniel Joseph Nolan

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer, LLC

One E. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

Steven Walter Mastrantonio

Attorney at Niekamp, Weisensell, Mutersbaugh & Mastrantonio,LLC

Third Floor, 23 S. Main St

Akron, OH 44308

Kathrin Mary Deutschle

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Jason Edward Hunter

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

303 West Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606-3300

Alexander Dominic Bono

Attorney at Duane Morris Llp

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4196

Forrest R Hansen

Attorney at Duane Morris Llp

30 South 17Th St.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Eric David Martin

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

211 North Broadway, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Jena M. Valdetero

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

161 North Clark Street, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60601

Katharine Flynn Lessaris

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

161 North Clark Street, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60601

Michael L. Hahn

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

303 West Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606-3300

Angela Marie Iaria, Ms.

Attorney at Lillig & Thorsness, Ltd.

1900 Spring Road, Suite 200

Oak Brook, IL 60523

Cornelius Edward McKnight

Attorney at McKnight & Kitzinger, LLC

805 N. Milwaukee Ave, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60642

Joanne M Krol

Attorney at Mcknight & Kitzinger, LLC

805 N. Milwaukee Ave, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60642

Nathan Pear Karlsgodt

Attorney at McKnight & Kitzinger LLC

805 N. Milwaukee Ave, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60642

Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Cornelius Edward McKnight

Attorney at McKnight & Kitzinger, LLC

805 N. Milwaukee Ave, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60642

Joanne M Krol

Attorney at Mcknight & Kitzinger, LLC

805 N. Milwaukee Ave, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60642

Nathan Pear Karlsgodt

Attorney at McKnight & Kitzinger LLC

805 N. Milwaukee Ave, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60642

Stanley A. Kitzinger

Attorney at McKnight & Kitzinger, LLC

805 N. Milwaukee Ave, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60642

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#403

(#403) STATUS Report Joint Status Report on Mediation by Nirav Thakkar (Wooten, Nick) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#402

(#402) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Status hearing held on 10/7/2019 and continued to 1/13/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Pretrial conference set for 3/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Jury trial reset to 5/4/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status report regarding mediation by 10/25/2019. (rao, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#401

(#401) STATUS Report Joint Status Report for Reassigned Case by Nirav Thakkar (Wooten, Nick) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

400 #1

Reassignment Status Report

#400

(#400) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:The parties are directed to use the attached outline for the joint status report. (Attachments: #1 Reassignment Status Report) (rao, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

399 #1

Initial Status Report outline

#399

(#399) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 9/27/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 10/7/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#398

(#398) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC by Jason Edward Hunter AMENDED (Hunter, Jason) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#397

(#397) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon reassignment of this case to Judge Pacold, any scheduled hearings will not be conducted by Judge Tharp. Any queries regarding modifications to the pretrial and trial schedule must be directed to Judge Pacold. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar by Stephen T. Sotelo (Sotelo, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#8

(#8) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record via email. (sxn, ) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The uncontested motion for an extension of time to answer #5 is granted. The defendants must answer by 12/1/15. No appearance on this motion is required. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of extension of time #5 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/17/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#5

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The uncontested motion for an extension of time to answer #5 is granted. The defendants must answer by 12/1/15. No appearance on this motion is required. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#4

(#4) Consent to Removal by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Maria Zoee Vathis (Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

606 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#403) STATUS Report Joint Status Report on Mediation by Nirav Thakkar (Wooten, Nick) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#402) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Status hearing held on 10/7/2019 and continued to 1/13/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Pretrial conference set for 3/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Jury trial reset to 5/4/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status report regarding mediation by 10/25/2019. (rao, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#401) STATUS Report Joint Status Report for Reassigned Case by Nirav Thakkar (Wooten, Nick) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#400) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:The parties are directed to use the attached outline for the joint status report. (Attachments: #1 Reassignment Status Report) (rao, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#399) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 9/27/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 10/7/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#398) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laudan Properties, LLC by Jason Edward Hunter AMENDED (Hunter, Jason) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#397) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon reassignment of this case to Judge Pacold, any scheduled hearings will not be conducted by Judge Tharp. Any queries regarding modifications to the pretrial and trial schedule must be directed to Judge Pacold. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#396) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0025 Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Martha M. Pacolds webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/23/2019.(las, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#395) RESPONSE by Baxol Properties, LLC(an Indian limited liability company) to MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 4 #367 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 5 #368 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 6 #354 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 1 #351 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 7 #355 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 2 #352 , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Green Group Corp.in limine No. 3 #353 and Related Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence of Breach (Rasp, Kevin) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#394) RESPONSE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(A Delaware limited liability company)in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar to take deposition of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Motion for Leave to Take a Trial Deposition of Ocwen Loan Servicing #347 (Hansen, Forrest) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
388 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nirav Thakkar by Stephen T. Sotelo (Sotelo, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record via email. (sxn, ) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The uncontested motion for an extension of time to answer #5 is granted. The defendants must answer by 12/1/15. No appearance on this motion is required. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Motion by Maria Zoee Vathis for presentment of extension of time #5 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/17/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION by Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time (Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (mgh, ) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent to Removal by Altisource Solutions, Inc. (Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altisource Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Maria Zoee Vathis (Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Will County, case number (15 L 713) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11273340. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vathis, Maria) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laudan Properties, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Greer Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTISOURCE SOLUTIONS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant