This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2019 at 07:40:11 (UTC).

Thacker v. King et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Thacker filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against King. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and Joe J. Volpe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00895

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

Referral Judge

Joe J. Volpe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harlie Thacker

Wrightsville, AR 72183-1010

Defendants

Carswell

Sonya Peppers

Denise Krablin

Romona Huff

Sharron King

Doe

Henery

Correct Care Solutions

Jackson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brent Jay Eubanks

Attorney at Humphries, Odum & Eubanks

1901 South Broadway

Little Rock, AR 72206

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harlie Thacker. (ljb) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#4

(#4) EXHIBITS to #2 Complaint by Harlie Thacker. (llg) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#9

(#9) GRIEVANCE Numbers and Days in Sick Call filed by Harlie Thacker. (ljb) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Jay Eubanks on behalf of Jackson (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/5/2018. (lej) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff be allowed to proceed with his inadequate dental care claim against Defendant Jackson. All remaining claims against Defendants King, Peppers, Carswell, Huff, Krablin, Correct Care Solutions, and Henery be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/21/2018. (lej) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#5

(#5) EXHIBITS filed by Harlie Thacker. (ljb) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendant Jackson without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/21/2018. (lej) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Jackson.(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#14

(#14) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/11/2019. Dispositive motions due by 8/12/2019. Dispositive motions on the issue of exhaustion due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/11/2019. (lej) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE to the Court by Harlie Thacker. (kdr) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Harlie Thacker. (ljb) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Harlie Thacker.(kdr) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/11/2019. Dispositive motions due by 8/12/2019. Dispositive motions on the issue of exhaustion due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/11/2019. (lej) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Jackson.(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Jay Eubanks on behalf of Jackson (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE to the Court by Harlie Thacker. (kdr) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) GRIEVANCE Numbers and Days in Sick Call filed by Harlie Thacker. (ljb) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff be allowed to proceed with his inadequate dental care claim against Defendant Jackson. All remaining claims against Defendants King, Peppers, Carswell, Huff, Krablin, Correct Care Solutions, and Henery be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/21/2018. (lej) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Jackson and forwarded to the USM for service. (lej) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendant Jackson without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/21/2018. (lej) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Harlie Thacker.(kdr) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXHIBITS filed by Harlie Thacker. (ljb) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXHIBITS to #2 Complaint by Harlie Thacker. (llg) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/5/2018. (lej) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Harlie Thacker. (ljb) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harlie Thacker. (ljb) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.