This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2019 at 08:05:20 (UTC).

Tennessee Valley Authority v. Vantiegham et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 Tennessee Valley Authority filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Vantiegham. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00282

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority

Defendants

Bridget Vantiegham

United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority

John Vantiegham

A TEMPORARY RIGHT TO ENTER UPON LAND IN MEIGS COUNTY, TENNESSEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

James S Chase

Tennessee Valley Authority, Office Of General Counsel, 400 West Summit Hill Drive

Knoxville, TN 37902

Michael Heith Frost

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC (Chattanooga)

832 Georgia Avenue, 1200 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Roger W Dickson

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC (Chattanooga)

832 Georgia Avenue, 1200 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

C Crews Townsend

Attorney at Miller & Martin

832 Georgia Avenue, Suite 1000 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402-2289

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/14/2019. (AML, ) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

18 #1

Exhibit TVA letters to landowners (redacted)

#18

(#18) LOCAL RULE 7.1(d) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF to #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TVA letters to landowners (redacted))(Chase, James) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority re #16 Certificate of Service, #15 Certificate of Service of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of January 3, 2019 (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Bridget Vantiegham (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America John Vantiegham (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit Project Description

#13

(#13) MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER OF POSSESSION. Defendants are ORDERED to immediately comply with this Order and to surrender possession of said real property to TVA pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on November 21, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on November 21, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on November 20, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #4

Notice of Condemnation

1 #3

Aerial Photograph

1 #2

Declaration of Taking

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against A TEMPORARY RIGHT TO ENTER UPON LAND IN MEIGS COUNTY, TENNESSEE, Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham, filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Taking, #3 Aerial Photograph, #4 Notice of Condemnation)(Chase, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/14/2019. (AML, ) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) LOCAL RULE 7.1(d) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF to #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TVA letters to landowners (redacted))(Chase, James) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority re #16 Certificate of Service, #15 Certificate of Service of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of January 3, 2019 (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Bridget Vantiegham (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America John Vantiegham (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Project Description, #2 Exhibit Map)(Chase, James) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by C Crews Townsend on behalf of Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER OF POSSESSION. Defendants are ORDERED to immediately comply with this Order and to surrender possession of said real property to TVA pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137, it is hereby ORDERED that the above referenced case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry S. Mattice, Jr., United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/4/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2018
  • No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to A Temporary Right to Enter Upon Land in Meigs County, Tennessee, Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham.. (AML, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Memorandum in Support (non-motion) : requirements due by 12/3/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Chase, James) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on November 21, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on November 21, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on November 20, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (RLK) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against A TEMPORARY RIGHT TO ENTER UPON LAND IN MEIGS COUNTY, TENNESSEE, Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham, filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Taking, #3 Aerial Photograph, #4 Notice of Condemnation)(Chase, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.