This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2018 at 07:54:51 (UTC).

TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC v. TEMPUS FLIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TEMPUS FLIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and D. BROCK HORNBY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00314

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

D. BROCK HORNBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC

Defendants

STONEBRIAR COMMERCIAL FINANCE LLC

TEMPUS FLIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC

SCF EQUIPMENT TRUST 2016-1 LLC

TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC - OWNER TRUSTEE UNDER TRUST DATED

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - INDENTURE TRUSTEE

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLY W. MCDONALD

Attorney at MURRAY PLUMB & MURRAY

75 Pearl Street, P.O. Box 9785

Portland, ME 04104-5085

ANDREW C HELMAN

Attorney at MURRAY PLUMB & MURRAY

75 Pearl Street, P.O. Box 9785

Portland, ME 04104-5085

SAGE M. FRIEDMAN

Attorney at MURRAY PLUMB & MURRAY

75 Pearl Street, P.O. Box 9785

Portland, ME 04104-5085

Defendant Attorneys

GREGORY PAUL HANSEL

Attorney at PRETI, FLAHERTY, BELIVEAU, & PACHIOS, LLP

One City Center, P.O. Box 9546, 791-3000, Fax: 791-3111

Portland, ME 04112-9546

DANIEL H. CHAREST

Attorney at BURNS CHAREST LLP

900 Jackson Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

LEELLE B. SLIFER

Attorney at BURNS CHAREST LLP

900 Jackson Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

JEREMY R. FISCHER

Attorney at DRUMMOND WOODSUM

84 Marginal Way, Suite 600

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) STIPULATION of Dismissal by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC. (HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

27 #1

Exhibit A

#27

(#27) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC. Reply due by 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#26

(#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/17/2018)(HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#25

(#25) Motion(s) joined by TEMPUS FLIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC : #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court (With Incorporated Memorandum of Law) filed by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC . (FISCHER, JEREMY) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

24 #2

Text of Proposed Order

24 #1

Exhibit A

#24

(#24) MOTION to Remand to State Court (With Incorporated Memorandum of Law) by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC Responses due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#23

(#23) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC. (HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

1 #9

Exhibit B Business Entity Information for Tempus Flight Solutions LLC

1 #8

SCF Equipment Trust summons

1 #7

US Bank National Association summons

1 #5

TVPX Aircraft Solutions Inc summons

1 #4

Tempus Flight Solutions LLC summons

1 #3

complaint

1 #2

summary sheet

1 #1

docket record

#1

Filing Fee Received from SCF EQUIPMENT TRUST 2016-1 LLC, STONEBRIAR COMMERCIAL FINANCE LLC, TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC - OWNER TRUSTEE UNDER TRUST DATED 11-15-17, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - INDENTURE TRUSTEE: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 218001491. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 8/17/18 re #1 Notice of Removal. (bfa) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) STIPULATION of Dismissal by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC. (HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC. Reply due by 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/17/2018)(HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Motion(s) joined by TEMPUS FLIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC : #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court (With Incorporated Memorandum of Law) filed by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC . (FISCHER, JEREMY) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Remand to State Court (With Incorporated Memorandum of Law) by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC Responses due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC. (HELMAN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset Deadlines per Consent Order ECF #22 as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Responses due by 9/18/2018. (jib) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CONSENT ORDER granting #20 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond, Motion to Amend Complaint, Motion to Extend Time to Seek Remand until 9/18/18 By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #13 MOTION to Extend Time: Docket entry modified by the clerk's office to indicate it was filed in error. It has been re-filed with corrections as #20 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond, Amend Complaint and to Seek Remand. (jib) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond, Motion to Amend Complaint, Motion to Extend Time to Seek Remand until 9/18/18 by TEMPUS JET CENTERS III LLC Responses due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCDONALD, KELLY). Modified on 9/10/2018 to clean up text and add MOTION to Amend Complaint, MOTION to Extend Time to Seek Remand (jib). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Jenifer Bennett. (jib) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SCF EQUIPMENT TRUST 2016-1 LLC, STONEBRIAR COMMERCIAL FINANCE LLC, TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC - OWNER TRUSTEE UNDER TRUST DATED 11-15-17, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - INDENTURE TRUSTEE Responses due by 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to TVPX Defendants' Motion to Dismiss -- Dry Lease, #2 Exhibit B to TVPX Defendants' Motion to Dismiss -- Title Report, #3 Text of Proposed Order on TVPX Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(HANSEL, GREGORY) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***Filed in Error - Duplicative of ECF #4*** NOTICE of Interested Parties by TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC - OWNER TRUSTEE UNDER TRUST DATED 11-15-17, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - INDENTURE TRUSTEE (HANSEL, GREGORY) Modified on 8/29/2018 to indicate filed in error (jib). (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties by SCF EQUIPMENT TRUST 2016-1 LLC, STONEBRIAR COMMERCIAL FINANCE LLC, TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (HANSEL, GREGORY) Modified on 8/29/2018 to add TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC and US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION as filing parties (jib). (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee Received from SCF EQUIPMENT TRUST 2016-1 LLC, STONEBRIAR COMMERCIAL FINANCE LLC, TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC - OWNER TRUSTEE UNDER TRUST DATED 11-15-17, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - INDENTURE TRUSTEE: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 218001491. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 8/17/18 re #1 Notice of Removal. (bfa) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/21/2018. (bfa) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Set Answer Deadline for TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC-OWNER TRUSTEE UNDER TRUST DATED 11-15-17, STONEBRIAR COMMERCIAL FINANCE LLC, SCF EQUIPMENT TRUST 2016-1 LLC, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION- INDENTURE TRUSTEE : Answer due by 8/21/2018. (bfa) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by SCF EQUIPMENT TRUST 2016-1 LLC, STONEBRIAR COMMERCIAL FINANCE LLC, TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC - OWNER TRUSTEE UNDER TRUST DATED 11-15-17, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - INDENTURE TRUSTEE. No PDF document attached. See #1 Notice of Removal. (bfa) Modified on 8/15/2018 to correct filing date (bfa). (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) Modified on 8/15/2018 to correct filing date (bfa). (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2018-00259. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by STONEBRIAR COMMERCIAL FINANCE LLC, SCF EQUIPMENT TRUST 2016-1 LLC, TVPX AIRCRAFT SOLUTIONS INC - OWNER TRUSTEE UNDER TRUST DATED 11-15-17, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - INDENTURE TRUSTEE. (Service of Process Deadline 11/13/2018) Fee due by 8/17/2018.(bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2018: #1 docket record, #2 summary sheet, #3 complaint, #4 Tempus Flight Solutions LLC summons, #5 TVPX Aircraft Solutions Inc summons, #6 Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC summons, #7 US Bank National Association summons, #8 SCF Equipment Trust summons, #9 Exhibit B Business Entity Information for Tempus Flight Solutions LLC) (bfa). Modified on 8/15/2018 to correct filing date(bfa). (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW C HELMAN