This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2018 at 20:12:34 (UTC).

Teletech Holdings Inc v. PCS LINK Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 Teletech Holdings Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PCS LINK Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beverly Reid O'Connell and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-00768

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beverly Reid O'Connell

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TeleTech Holdings, Inc.

Defendant

PCS Link, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emily V Pastorius

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 19 , ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rfi)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/23/2016. (rfi)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 19 , ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rfi)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/23/2016. (rfi)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCS Link, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where TTEC HOLDINGS INC is a litigant