This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2020 at 05:44:19 (UTC).

Tecson v. Robinhood Crypto, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Tecson filed an Other lawsuit against Robinhood Crypto, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-05185

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vivian Tecson

Defendants

Robinhood Crypto, LLC

Robinhood Markets, Inc.

Robinhood Financial LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Zelenski

Attorney at Zelenski Law, PC

2129 West Silver Lake Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90039

Abigail Ameri Zelenski

Attorney at Zelenski Law

300 W. Glenoaks Blvd. Suite 300

Glendale, CA 91202

Michael Joe Jaurigue

Attorney at Jaurigue Law Group

300 West Glenoaks Blvd., Suite 300

Glendale, CA 91202

Defendant Attorney

Jacob Marcus Heath

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION for Extension to Respond to Complaint filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Vivian Tecson Notice of Separation of Attorney (Zelenski, Abigail) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Vivian Tecson (Notice of Separation of Attorney) (Zelenski, David) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION for Extension to Respond to Complaint filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Vivian Tecson (Zelenski, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vivian Tecson.. (Zelenski, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION [JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT] filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Robinhood Markets, Inc. for Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #5

Declaration of Abhishek Fatehpuria in Support of Defendants' Notive of Remo

1 #4

Declaration of Jacob M. Heath in Support of Defendants' Notive of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION for Extension to Respond to Complaint filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Vivian Tecson Notice of Separation of Attorney (Zelenski, Abigail) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Vivian Tecson (Notice of Separation of Attorney) (Zelenski, David) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION for Extension to Respond to Complaint filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • (#12) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Vivian Tecson (Zelenski, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vivian Tecson.. (Zelenski, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION [JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT] filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • (#3) FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-12622043). (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Robinhood Markets, Inc. for Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of CIVIL ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Section 1331, 1332(D), 1441, 1446, and 1453 from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 18cv323584. (). Filed byRobinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Declaration of Jacob M. Heath in Support of Defendants' Notive of Removal, #5 Declaration of Abhishek Fatehpuria in Support of Defendants' Notive of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Markets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abigail Ameri Zelenski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Joe Jaurigue