This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 07:59:55 (UTC).

TDJ Inc v. Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 TDJ Inc filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Nuffer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00056

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Nuffer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TDJ Inc

Defendant

Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau

Interested Party

Zion's Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James L. Barnett

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

222 S Main St Ste 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Steven P. Young

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

222 S Main St Ste 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Nathan R. Runyan

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

222 S Main St Ste 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff TDJ Inc (Barnett, James) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 6 Order to Show Cause,, filed by TDJ Inc. (Barnett, James) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/30/18 (alt) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3092058) filed by TDJ Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Barnett, James) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff TDJ Inc is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jwt) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Terminated per #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to case (alt) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff TDJ Inc (Barnett, James) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 6 Order to Show Cause,, filed by TDJ Inc. (Barnett, James) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • (#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiff is directed to respond in writing within 7 days from the date of this order and inform the Court why it has standing under 26 U.S.C. 7426(a)(1) to contest the levy at issue here. 26 U.S.C. 7426(a)(1) specifies that "the person against whom is assessed the tax out of which such levy arose" may not assert a civil claim of wrongful levy against the United States. Plaintiff must articulate why, as a taxpayer against whom tax has been assessed and a levy entered, it has standing. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 08/30/18. (akj) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/30/18 (alt) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • (#4) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 8/30/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3092058) filed by TDJ Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Barnett, James) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff TDJ Inc is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jwt) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.