This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 08:00:30 (UTC).

Taylor v. Shreveport

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Taylor filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Shreveport. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01291

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emilio Enrique Taylor

Shreveport, LA 71137

Defendants

Police Dept of Shreveport

C S Heard

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Emilio Enrique Taylor RECOMMENDING that Plaintiffs claims for monetary compensation be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failing to state claims on which relief can be granted. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs request for dismissal of all charges be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs right to pursue habeas corpus relief after he exhausts all available state court remedies. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/15/2018. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#10

(#10) JUDGMENT Adopting #6 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge Dismissing #1 Complaint filed by Emilio Enrique Taylor With Prejudice as frivolous and for failing to state claims on which relief can be granted. It Is Further Ordered that Plaintiff's request for dismissal of all charges is Dismissed Without Prejudice to Plaintiffs right to pursue habeas corpus relief after he exhausts all available state court remedies. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/1/2018. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#5

(#5) EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint by Emilio Enrique Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Police Dept of Shreveport filed by Emilio Enrique Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $10.67. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/4/2018. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

2 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Emilio Enrique Taylor. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM RULING re #6 Report and Recommendation and Granting #7 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/1/2018. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Enrique Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

7 #1

Envelope

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JUDGMENT Adopting #6 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge Dismissing #1 Complaint filed by Emilio Enrique Taylor With Prejudice as frivolous and for failing to state claims on which relief can be granted. It Is Further Ordered that Plaintiff's request for dismissal of all charges is Dismissed Without Prejudice to Plaintiffs right to pursue habeas corpus relief after he exhausts all available state court remedies. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/1/2018. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Police Dept of Shreveport, C S Heard filed by Emilio Enrique Taylor.(crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM RULING re #6 Report and Recommendation and Granting #7 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/1/2018. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Emilio Enrique Taylor. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Emilio Enrique Taylor RECOMMENDING that Plaintiffs claims for monetary compensation be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failing to state claims on which relief can be granted. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs request for dismissal of all charges be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs right to pursue habeas corpus relief after he exhausts all available state court remedies. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/15/2018. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint by Emilio Enrique Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $10.67. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/4/2018. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Enrique Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Police Dept of Shreveport filed by Emilio Enrique Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.