This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:33:05 (UTC).

Taylor v. SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Taylor filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray H Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02932

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Taylor

Defendant

SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Clifton Alexander

Attorney at Anderson, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Phelps Burnside

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

701 Poydras Street, Ste 3500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnside, Andrew) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20736949) filed by John Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

6 #1

Proposed Order

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC, filed.(Burnside, Andrew) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file answer.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC, filed.(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Taylor, filed.(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/31/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC, filed.(Burnside, Andrew) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018, filed.(Alexander, William) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file answer.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC, filed.(Burnside, Andrew) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC, filed.(Burnside, Andrew) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnside, Andrew) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018, filed.(Alexander, William) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Taylor, filed.(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Summons Issued as to SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/31/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC, filed.(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20736949) filed by John Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.