This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2019 at 07:21:35 (UTC).

Taylor v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Taylor filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina S. Edwards and Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00830

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Regina S. Edwards

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. McKinley, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joetta Taylor

Defendants

Trans Union, LLC

TD Bank USA, N.A.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James H. Lawson

Attorney at Lawson at Law, PLLC

115 S. Sherrin Avenue, Suite 5

Louisville, KY 40207

James R. McKenzie

Attorney at James R. McKenzie Attorney, PLLC

115 S. Sherrin Avenue, Suite 5

Louisville, KY 40207

Defendant Attorneys

Sandra D. Jansen

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, PC

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Joseph M. Windler

Attorney at Winthrop & Weinstine, P.A.

225 S. Sixth St., Suite 3500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Chapin E. Scheumann

Attorney at Schiller Barnes Maloney PLLC

401 West Main, Suite 1600

Louisville, KY 40202

Margaret Jane Brannon

Attorney at Jackson Kelly, PLLC - Lexington

175 E. Main St., Suite 500

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/12/19; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph M. Windler. cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

16 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

16 #2

Exhibit Attachment A to Exhibit 1

16 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion

#16

(#16) MOTION for Joseph M. Windler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2802937. by Defendant TD Bank USA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion, #2 Exhibit Attachment A to Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Scheumann, Chapin) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/29/18: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 2/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/5/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel, CM-Edwards (DJT) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Joseph M. Windler re #12 Answer to Complaint. Attorney not admitted to practice in the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/11/2019. (JM) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Scheumann, Chapin) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Scheumann, Chapin) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#11

(#11) AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/18/19: TD Bank USA, N.A. shall file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than 1/25/2019. cc:counsel (DJT) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#8

(#8) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Scheumann, Chapin) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TD Bank USA, N.A., Trans Union, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2769974., filed by Joetta Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (JM) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/12/19; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph M. Windler. cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Joseph M. Windler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2802937. by Defendant TD Bank USA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion, #2 Exhibit Attachment A to Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Scheumann, Chapin) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/29/18: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 2/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/5/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel, CM-Edwards (DJT) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Joseph M. Windler re #12 Answer to Complaint. Attorney not admitted to practice in the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/11/2019. (JM) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Scheumann, Chapin) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Scheumann, Chapin) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/18/19: TD Bank USA, N.A. shall file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than 1/25/2019. cc:counsel (DJT) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Scheumann, Chapin) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 12/17/2018: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable REGINA S. EDWARDS, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of nondispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TD Bank USA, N.A., Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to TD Bank USA, N.A., #2 Summons issued to Trans Union, LLC) (JM) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. Magistrate Judge designation: Regina S. Edwards. (JM) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TD Bank USA, N.A., Trans Union, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2769974., filed by Joetta Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (JM) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less