This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2019 at 07:54:45 (UTC).

Taylor et al v. GCA Educational Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 Taylor filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against GCA Educational Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Edward G. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01225

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Edward G. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marcus Taylor

Travis Taylor

Defendants

GCA Educational Services, Inc.

ABM Janitorial Services, Inc.

GCA Services Group, Inc.

ABM Industry Groups, LLC

ABM Building Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Paula Rachelle Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4, #4 Summons 5)(mbm) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

1 #4

Summons ABM Building Solutions, LLC to be Issued

3 #2

Summons 3

1 #5

Summons ABM Industry Groups, LLC to be Issued

#2

(#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

1 #8

Summons GCA Services Group, Inc. to be Issued

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Rachelle Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Paula) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

3 #3

Summons 4

1 #7

Summons GCA Educational Services, Inc. to be Issued

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2925138), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Marcus Taylor Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit B- Travis Taylor Consent to Join, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons ABM Building Solutions, LLC to be Issued, #5 Summons ABM Industry Groups, LLC to be Issued, #6 Summons ABM Janitorial Services, Inc. to be Issued, #7 Summons GCA Educational Services, Inc. to be Issued, #8 Summons GCA Services Group, Inc. to be Issued)(Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A- Marcus Taylor Consent to Join

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B- Travis Taylor Consent to Join

1 #6

Summons ABM Janitorial Services, Inc. to be Issued

3 #4

Summons 5

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Rachelle Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Paula) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4, #4 Summons 5)(mbm) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2925138), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Marcus Taylor Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit B- Travis Taylor Consent to Join, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons ABM Building Solutions, LLC to be Issued, #5 Summons ABM Industry Groups, LLC to be Issued, #6 Summons ABM Janitorial Services, Inc. to be Issued, #7 Summons GCA Educational Services, Inc. to be Issued, #8 Summons GCA Services Group, Inc. to be Issued)(Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.