This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:03:09 (UTC).

Taylor #326905 v. Parish

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Taylor 326905 filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Parish. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00946

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ronnie Odell Taylor #326905

Manistee, MI 49660

Respondent

Les Parish

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Attachments A-B

#2

(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 that the action be denied; objections to R&R due within 14 days ; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Ronnie Odell Taylor #326905 (Attachments: #1 Attachments A-B) (ems) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Report and Recommendation (Screening) #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Ronnie Odell Taylor #326905 (ems) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 that the action be denied; objections to R&R due within 14 days ; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number GR062286 (ems) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Ronnie Odell Taylor #326905 (Attachments: #1 Attachments A-B) (ems) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less