This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:25:09 (UTC).

TATE v. WIGGINS et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 TATE filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against WIGGINS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kim R. Gibson and Keith A. Pesto. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00230

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kim R. Gibson

Referral Judge

Keith A. Pesto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDELL TATE

Somerset, PA 15510

Defendants

MELISSA HAINSWORTH

ERIC TICE

JENNIFER MCCLELLAND

BRIAN HYDE

CARR

CHRISTIE ACHENCK

S. WIGGINS

MARK BURKE

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Partial Payment of Filing Fee by LINDELL TATE. Fee $7.88, receipt number 34668004734. (plp) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#9

(#9) Partial Payment of Filing Fee by LINDELL TATE. Fee $7.00, receipt number 34668004742. (plp) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is Ordered that the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim without leave to amend as recommended in the Report and Recommendation at ECF No. #2 , which is adopted as the opinion of the Court. The Clerk shall mark this matter closed, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/17/2018. (dlg) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#7

(#7) Partial Payment of Filing Fee by LINDELL TATE. Fee $3.78, receipt number 34668004706. (plp) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) MOTION for Clarification by LINDELL TATE. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) OBJECTIONS to Report and Recommendation by LINDELL TATE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (plp) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against CHRISTIE ACHENCK, MARK BURKE, CARR, MELISSA HAINSWORTH, BRIAN HYDE, JENNIFER MCCLELLAND, ERIC TICE, S. WIGGINS, filed by LINDELL TATE. (plp) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the inmate account officer at any institution where plaintiff may be incarcerated shall forward to the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania monthly installments until the entire filing fee has been paid, regardless of any dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 11/19/2018. (plp) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

proposed complaint

1 #1

inmate account statement

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LINDELL TATE. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 inmate account statement, #2 proposed complaint, #3 Envelope) (plp) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Partial Payment of Filing Fee by LINDELL TATE. Fee $7.88, receipt number 34668004734. (plp) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Partial Payment of Filing Fee by LINDELL TATE. Fee $7.00, receipt number 34668004742. (plp) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is Ordered that the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim without leave to amend as recommended in the Report and Recommendation at ECF No. #2 , which is adopted as the opinion of the Court. The Clerk shall mark this matter closed, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/17/2018. (dlg) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Partial Payment of Filing Fee by LINDELL TATE. Fee $3.78, receipt number 34668004706. (plp) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER denying #5 Motion for Clarification; document is a supplement to plaintiff's #4 objections to the #2 report and recommendation and will be treated as such. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 12/6/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (plp) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Clarification by LINDELL TATE. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) OBJECTIONS to Report and Recommendation by LINDELL TATE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (plp) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint filed by LINDELL TATE, recommending that the complaint be dismissed without leave to amend;. Objections to R&R due by 12/3/2018 Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 12/6/2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 11/18/2018. (w/document #2 ) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (plp) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against CHRISTIE ACHENCK, MARK BURKE, CARR, MELISSA HAINSWORTH, BRIAN HYDE, JENNIFER MCCLELLAND, ERIC TICE, S. WIGGINS, filed by LINDELL TATE. (plp) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the inmate account officer at any institution where plaintiff may be incarcerated shall forward to the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania monthly installments until the entire filing fee has been paid, regardless of any dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 11/19/2018. (plp) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LINDELL TATE. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 inmate account statement, #2 proposed complaint, #3 Envelope) (plp) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less