This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2019 at 07:43:11 (UTC).

Tarver v. Tyson Foods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Tarver filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tyson Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00897

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kristine G. Baker

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Icey Tarver

Chicago, IL 60628

Defendant

Tyson Foods Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carla Elizabeth Buterman

Attorney at Law Office of Carla E. Buterman, LLC

53 W. Jackson Blvd, Suite 1128

Chicago, IL 60604

Phillip Aaron Brigham

Attorney at Law Office Of Phillip Brigham, Llc

53 West Jackson, Suite 1128

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Steven L. Brenneman

Attorney at Fox Swibel Levin & Carroll LLP

200 W Madison Street, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Kathlyn Graves

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Icey Tarver; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14214037.(Buterman, Carla) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/09/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Buterman, Carla) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/09/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Icey Tarver by Carla Elizabeth Buterman (Buterman, Carla) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/09/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/12/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. by Steven L. Brenneman (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. by Steven L. Brenneman for L. Brandon Liss (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/26/2018)

#7

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Steven L. Brenneman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/4/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/28/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Steven L. Brenneman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/4/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/28/2018)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Tyson Foods, Inc. (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/28/2018)

#38

(#38) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to remove attorneys Carla Elizabeth Buterman and Phillip Aaron Brigham, as counsel of record in this matter for failure to comply with the Local Rules of the Eastern District of Arkansas; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the plaintiff at the address included in Exhibit B of the Amended Complaint; and directing the plaintiff to respond in writing within 30 days of this Order informing the Court if she will be proceeding pro se, or if she will be retaining counsel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/4/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#37

(#37) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Tyson Foods Inc (Graves, Kathlyn) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#22

(#36) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Tyson Foods Inc.(Graves, Kathlyn)(Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to correct the linkage)(jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#36

(#36) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Tyson Foods Inc.(Graves, Kathlyn)(Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to correct the linkage)(jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#34

(#34) ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/7/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathlyn Graves on behalf of Tyson Foods Inc (Graves, Kathlyn) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

32 #1

*Restricted*

#32

(#32) Case electronically transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01739. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#31

(#31) TRANSFERRED to the the Eastern District of Arkansas the electronic record. (sxb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/30/2018)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to remove attorneys Carla Elizabeth Buterman and Phillip Aaron Brigham, as counsel of record in this matter for failure to comply with the Local Rules of the Eastern District of Arkansas; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the plaintiff at the address included in Exhibit B of the Amended Complaint; and directing the plaintiff to respond in writing within 30 days of this Order informing the Court if she will be proceeding pro se, or if she will be retaining counsel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/4/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Tyson Foods Inc (Graves, Kathlyn) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #36 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #22 Amended Complaint. (jak) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Tyson Foods Inc.(Graves, Kathlyn)(Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to correct the linkage)(jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #34 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (kbc) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/7/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathlyn Graves on behalf of Tyson Foods Inc (Graves, Kathlyn) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Case electronically transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01739. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) TRANSFERRED to the the Eastern District of Arkansas the electronic record. (sxb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/29/2018. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Tyson Foods, Inc. (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Steven L. Brenneman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/4/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Plead (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. by Steven L. Brenneman for L. Brandon Liss (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. by Steven L. Brenneman (Brenneman, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (jn, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Icey Tarver by Carla Elizabeth Buterman (Buterman, Carla) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Buterman, Carla) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Icey Tarver; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14214037.(Buterman, Carla) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.