This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:56:35 (UTC).

Tapp v. Brady

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Tapp filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Brady. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H. McKinley, Jr and H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00159

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. McKinley, Jr

Referral Judge

H. Brent Brennenstuhl

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Troy Tapp

Henderson, KY 42419

Respondent

Amy Brady

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Troy Tapp. (DJT) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/3/2018) (DJT). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/8/18: The Clerk of Court shall forward by certified mail, return receipt requested one copy of the petition (DN #1 ) and this Order on Respondent and the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Kentucky. Respondent shall file an answer herein within 40 days from the date of entry of this Order. The answer must address the allegations in the petition. In addition, it must state whether any claim in the petition is barred by a failure to exhaust state remedies, a procedural bar, non-retroactivity, or a statute of limitations. Respondent also shall electronically file portions of the state-court record pertinent to the issues raised in the petition and answer, including but not limited to exhibits, docket sheets, transcripts, and pleadings. Petitioner may file a reply no later than 21 days following service of Respondents answer. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner a copy of the Pro SePrisoner Handbook. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) & (B) for rulings on all non-dispositive motions; for appropriate hearings, if necessary; and for findings of fact and recommendations on any dispositive matter.cc: Petitioner(pro se), Respondent, Atty General, HBB (DJT) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE TO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL re #6 Order. (JM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/8/18: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove DN 4 from the docket sheet of the instant action and docket it as an amended complaint in Civil Action No. 4:18CV-P133-JHM. The Clerk is additionally DIRECTED to remove the Defendants listed in the amended complaint from the docket sheet of the instant case. cc: Petitioner(pro se) (DJT) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE TO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL re #6 Order. (JM) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/8/18: The Clerk of Court shall forward by certified mail, return receipt requested one copy of the petition (DN #1 ) and this Order on Respondent and the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Kentucky. Respondent shall file an answer herein within 40 days from the date of entry of this Order. The answer must address the allegations in the petition. In addition, it must state whether any claim in the petition is barred by a failure to exhaust state remedies, a procedural bar, non-retroactivity, or a statute of limitations. Respondent also shall electronically file portions of the state-court record pertinent to the issues raised in the petition and answer, including but not limited to exhibits, docket sheets, transcripts, and pleadings. Petitioner may file a reply no later than 21 days following service of Respondents answer. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner a copy of the Pro SePrisoner Handbook. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) & (B) for rulings on all non-dispositive motions; for appropriate hearings, if necessary; and for findings of fact and recommendations on any dispositive matter.cc: Petitioner(pro se), Respondent, Atty General, HBB (DJT) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/8/18: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove DN 4 from the docket sheet of the instant action and docket it as an amended complaint in Civil Action No. 4:18CV-P133-JHM. The Clerk is additionally DIRECTED to remove the Defendants listed in the amended complaint from the docket sheet of the instant case. cc: Petitioner(pro se) (DJT) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • (#4) This Entry REMOVED per ORDER #5 entered this date. Modified on 11/9/2018 (DJT). (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number L33057158 by Troy Tapp. (DJT) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Troy Tapp. (DJT) Modified security on 10/5/2018 (JM). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Troy Tapp. (DJT) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/3/2018) (DJT). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.