This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 17:24:28 (UTC).

Tanana Chiefs Conference et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 Tanana Chiefs Conference filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-OP-46268

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation

Southcentral Foundation

Chugachmiut, Inc.

Defendants

Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt PLC

Insys Therapeutics Inc.

Allergan PLC

Health Mart Systems, Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Kroger Co.

Cephalon Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lloyd B Miller

Attorney at Sonosky Chambers Sachse Endreson & Perry

1425 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 2005

Elizabeth J. Cabraser

Attorney at Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein - San Francisco

3000 Embarcadero Center, W, 275 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Albertsons Companies LLC. (P,R) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#9

(#9) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alaska. Case number 3:18-cv-00260. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#7

(#7) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-67) - 14 action(s) re: pldg. (2 in AK/3:18-cv-00260, 1 in GAN/3:18-cv-00131, 2 in ID/1:18-cv-00479, 1 in KYW/1:18-cv-00158, 1 in KYW/3:18-cv-00714, 1 in KYW/3:18-cv-00715, 1 in KYW/3:18-cv-00716, 1 in KYW/4:18-cv-00169, 3024 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:18-cv-01882, 1 in MSN/4:18-cv-00212, 2 in NCE/5:18-cv-00517, 2 in OR/3:18-cv-01911, 1 in UT/2:18-cv-00863, 1 in WVS/2:18-cv-01392) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case transfer to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants, filed by Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Chugachmiut, Inc., Southcentral Foundation, Copper River Native Association, Arctic Slope Native Association.(Miller, Lloyd) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Cases by Chugachmiut, Inc., Copper River Native Association, Southcentral Foundation, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation (Miller, Lloyd) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Miller, Lloyd) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2602670.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Miller, Lloyd) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Albertsons Companies LLC. (P,R) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alaska. Case number 3:18-cv-00260. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-67) - 14 action(s) re: pldg. (2 in AK/3:18-cv-00260, 1 in GAN/3:18-cv-00131, 2 in ID/1:18-cv-00479, 1 in KYW/1:18-cv-00158, 1 in KYW/3:18-cv-00714, 1 in KYW/3:18-cv-00715, 1 in KYW/3:18-cv-00716, 1 in KYW/4:18-cv-00169, 3024 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:18-cv-01882, 1 in MSN/4:18-cv-00212, 2 in NCE/5:18-cv-00517, 2 in OR/3:18-cv-01911, 1 in UT/2:18-cv-00863, 1 in WVS/2:18-cv-01392) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case transfer to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants, filed by Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Chugachmiut, Inc., Southcentral Foundation, Copper River Native Association, Arctic Slope Native Association.(Miller, Lloyd) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • (#5) JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable John W. Sedwick for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:18-cv-00260-JWS. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE: This case is related to case number 3:18-cv-00243-JWS and 3:18-cv-00247-JWS, which are assigned to the Honorable Judge John W. Sedwick. (CME, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Related Cases by Chugachmiut, Inc., Copper River Native Association, Southcentral Foundation, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation (Miller, Lloyd) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Miller, Lloyd) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2602670.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Miller, Lloyd) [Transferred from akd on 11/27/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chugachmiut is a litigant

Latest cases where Southcentral Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant